Del Rancho Produce v. Sunburst Farms et al
Plaintiff: Del Rancho Produce
Defendant: Sunburst Farms, D&R Foods, Maria Blanco, Daniel Webster and Roy V. Cook
Case Number: 2:2018cv00579
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Maria Blanco, Sunburst Farms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Del Rancho Produce PACA License, #2 Exhibit B - Payment Instruments (Part 1 of 3), #3 Exhibit B - Payment Instruments (Part 2 of 3), #4 Exhibit B - Payment Instruments (Part 3 of 3), #5 Exhibit C - Invoice Summary)(Gembala, Ryan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Del Rancho Produce as to Roy V. Cook Waiver sent on 8/27/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Stokes, Craig)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Gembala for Maria Blanco,Ryan Gembala for Sunburst Farms. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/27/2018. (las)
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan M. Gembala , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3088800, filed by Defendants Maria Blanco, Sunburst Farms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunaway, Alan)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for D&R Foods answer due 9/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/14/2018. (las)
August 13, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant D&R Foods. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Attorney Caleb S. Cottam added to party D&R Foods(pty:dft)(Cottam, Caleb) Modified on 8/14/2018 by correcting motion type (las).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Maria Blanco answer due 9/3/2018; Sunburst Farms answer due 9/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/10/2018. (las)
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint filed by Defendants Maria Blanco, Sunburst Farms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Attorney Alan Dunaway added to party Maria Blanco(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Dunaway added to party Sunburst Farms(pty:dft)(Dunaway, Alan) Modified on 8/13/2018 by correcting motion type (las).
July 24, 2018 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Del Rancho Produce as to Maria Blanco served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Stokes, Craig)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Del Rancho Produce as to D&R Foods served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Stokes, Craig)
July 24, 2018 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Del Rancho Produce as to Sunburst Farms served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Stokes, Craig)
July 24, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Del Rancho Produce identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Stokes, Craig)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Roy V. Cook. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Maria Blanco. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Daniel Webster. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to D&R Foods. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sunburst Farms. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Maria Blanco, Roy V. Cook, D&R Foods, Sunburst Farms, Daniel Webster (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3058057) filed by Del Rancho Produce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - D&R Open Invoices, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Sunburst Open Invoices Part 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Sunburst Open Invoices Part 2 of 2) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Stokes, Craig)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Del Rancho Produce is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Rancho Produce v. Sunburst Farms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunburst Farms
Represented By: Ryan M. Gembala
Represented By: Alan Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&R Foods
Represented By: Caleb S. Cottam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Blanco
Represented By: Ryan M. Gembala
Represented By: Alan Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy V. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del Rancho Produce
Represented By: Craig A. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?