Smith v. Lifevantage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brian Smith and Michael Ilardo
Defendant: Ryan Goodwin, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose and Darren Jensen
Case Number: 2:2018cv00621
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Kochanowski for Michael Ilardo,Andrew Kochanowski for Brian Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/21/2018. (las)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Benjamin King for Michael Ilardo,J. Benjamin King for Brian Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/21/2018. (las)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #76 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lance C. Young for Michael Ilardo,Lance C. Young for Brian Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/21/2018. (las)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Adam Swick for Michael Ilardo,R. Adam Swick for Brian Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/21/2018. (las)
September 21, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Michael Ilardo, Brian Smith, Defendants Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation. Form due by 10/9/2018. (las)
September 20, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Benjamin King , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3107981, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Christensen, Steven)
September 20, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Kochanowski , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3107974, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Christensen, Steven)
September 20, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Adam Swick , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3107963, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Christensen, Steven)
September 20, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lance C. Young , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3107948, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Christensen, Steven)
September 20, 2018 Filing 75 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation with Jury Demand. New Plaintiffs: Michael Ilardo. filed by Brian Smith. (Christensen, Steven)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Melsheimer for Ryan Goodwin,Thomas M. Melsheimer for Darren Jensen,Thomas M. Melsheimer for Lifevantage Corporation,Thomas M. Melsheimer for Justin Rose. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/22/2018. No attached document. (las)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #69 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rex A. Mann for Ryan Goodwin,Rex A. Mann for Darren Jensen,Rex A. Mann for Lifevantage Corporation,Rex A. Mann for Justin Rose. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/22/2018. No attached document. (las)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #68 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brad D. Ryynanen for Ryan Goodwin,Brad D. Ryynanen for Darren Jensen,Brad D. Ryynanen for Lifevantage Corporation,Brad D. Ryynanen for Justin Rose. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/22/2018. No attached document. (las)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #67 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C.C. Sanders, Jr for Ryan Goodwin,John C.C. Sanders, Jr for Darren Jensen,John C.C. Sanders, Jr for Lifevantage Corporation,John C.C. Sanders, Jr for Justin Rose. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/22/2018. No attached document. (las)
August 21, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Melsheimer , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3085746, filed by Defendants Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice (Thomas M. Melsheimer))(Johansen, Bryan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rex A. Mann , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3085706, filed by Defendants Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit ECF Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice (Rex Mann))(Johansen, Bryan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brad Ryynanen , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3085681, filed by Defendants Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice (Brad Ryynanen))(Johansen, Bryan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Sanders , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3085645, filed by Defendants Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Johansen, Bryan)
August 20, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan S. Johansen on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Johansen, Bryan)
August 20, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Reymann on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Reymann, David)
August 20, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Hunt on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Hunt, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Clark on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Clark, Robert)
August 6, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney John Matthew Doroghazi, John C.C. Sanders, Lane M. Webster, Rex Mann, Thomas Melsheimer, for Defendants Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (jwt)
August 6, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney J. Benjamin King, Randall Adam Swick, for Plaintiff Brian Smith (jwt)
August 6, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Andrew Kochanowski, for Plaintiff Brian Smith (jwt)
August 6, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney James K. Robertson, Jr.; Brian T. Henebry, for Plaintiff Brian Smith (jwt)
August 6, 2018 Filing 58 Case transferred in from USDC of Connecticut; Case Number 3:18-cv-00135. Case assigned USDC of Utah number 2:18cv621-DBP. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 3, 2018 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Jaiman, R.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER approving #56 Stipulation; denying as moot #38 Motion to Strike; denying as moot #40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #39 Motion to Transfer to Another District. The Clerk is directed to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah, Central Division, and close the case. The Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint within 45 days of the case being opened in the District of Utah, and the Defendants shall file any responsive pleading within 45 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/24/18. (Kaas, E.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 56 STIPULATION Re: Motions to Dismiss, Strike & Transfer by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time until July 23, 2018 to file Stipulation re #38 , #39 , and #40 . Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/16/18. (Kaas, E.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 54 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 23, 2018 To File Stipulation #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), #38 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Paragraph 112,, #39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Cordani terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/9/18. (Kaas, E.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #38 MOTION to Strike, #39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District, #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/28/2018. Responses due by July 16, 2018. (Jamieson, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 51 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), #38 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Paragraph 112,, #39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue until July 16, 2018 by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #38 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Paragraph 112, #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), #39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue. Responses due by 7/2/2018. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/15/2018. (Schneider, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for John L. Cordani, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by Brian Smith. (Cordani, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), #38 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Paragraph 112,, #39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue until July 2, 2018 by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #38 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, & #39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/01/2018. Responses due by June 18, 2018. (Jamieson, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 46 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), #38 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Paragraph 112,, #39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue until June 18, 2018 by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Benjamin King on behalf of Brian Smith (King, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Adam Swick on behalf of Brian Smith (Swick, Randall) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #38 MOTION to Strike, #39 MOTION to Transfer, #40 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/24/2018.Responses due by June 4, 2018. (Jamieson, K)[Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 42 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), #38 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Paragraph 112,, #39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue until June 4, 2018 by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #31 MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Meeting Deadline. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/17/2018. (Jamieson, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose.Responses due by 5/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Jensen Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2 - Rose Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 3 - Goodwin Affidavit)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Transfer to Another District /Venue by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memo ISO Motion, #3 Exhibit 1-A to Memo ISO Motion, #4 Exhibit 1-B to Memo ISO Motion, #5 Exhibit 1-C to Memo ISO Motion, #6 Exhibit 1-D to Memo ISO Motion, #7 Exhibit 1-E to Memo ISO Motion, #8 Exhibit 1-F to Memo ISO Motion, #9 Exhibit 2 to Memo ISO Motion)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Paragraph 112, by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose.Responses due by 5/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) J. Benjamin King to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4740843) by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) R. Adam Swick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4740818) by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Lane M. Webster on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Webster, Lane) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Rex Mann on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Mann, Rex) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by John C.C. Sanders on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Sanders, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Melsheimer on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Deadlines Pending a Decision on Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose.Responses due by 4/6/2018 (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Attorney Lane M. Webster to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Attorney Rex A. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lane M. Webster to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4754279) by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lane M. Webster, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rex A. Mann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4754268) by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rex A. Mann, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas M. Melsheimer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4754258) by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas M. Melsheimer, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) John C.C. Sanders, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4754234) by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John C.C. Sanders, Jr., #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Attorney J. Benjamin King to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/4/2018. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Attorney R. Adam Swick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/4/2018. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) J. Benjamin King to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4740843) by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) R. Adam Swick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4740818) by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants to April 16, 2018. (Jamieson, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 02/22/2018. (Jamieson, K) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 16, 2018 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint, by Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose. (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lifevantage Corporation. (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Matthew Doroghazi on behalf of Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 14 RICO Case Statement by Brian Smith. (Kochanowski, Andrew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Smith. Lifevantage Corporation served on 2/2/2018, answer due 2/23/2018. (Kochanowski, Andrew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Kochanowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4701462) by Brian Smith. (Kochanowski, Andrew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kochanowski on behalf of Brian Smith (Kochanowski, Andrew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Attorney Andrew Kochanowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/2/2018. Signed by Clerk on 2/1/2018. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Kochanowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4701462) by Brian Smith. (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Louis Cordani, Jr on behalf of Brian Smith (Cordani, John) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Henebry on behalf of Brian Smith (Henebry, Brian) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ryan Goodwin, Darren Jensen, Lifevantage Corporation, Justin Rose* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James K. Robertson, Jr.* *Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH* *195 Church St. 18th floor, PO Box 1950* *New Haven, CT 06509-1950*. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Brian Smith Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 4/24/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2018. Discovery due by 7/26/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2018. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2018.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Robertson, James) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Brian Smith. (Robertson, James) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4691690.), filed by Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Robertson, James) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Lifevantage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Goodwin
Represented By: Rex A. Mann
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Represented By: Thomas M. Melsheimer
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: John C.C. Sanders, Jr
Represented By: Robert S. Clark
Represented By: Bradley D. Ryynanen
Represented By: Bryan S. Johansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifevantage Corporation
Represented By: Rex A. Mann
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Represented By: Thomas M. Melsheimer
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: John C.C. Sanders, Jr
Represented By: Robert S. Clark
Represented By: Bradley D. Ryynanen
Represented By: Bryan S. Johansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rose
Represented By: Rex A. Mann
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Represented By: Thomas M. Melsheimer
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: John C.C. Sanders, Jr
Represented By: Robert S. Clark
Represented By: Bradley D. Ryynanen
Represented By: Bryan S. Johansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Jensen
Represented By: Rex A. Mann
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Represented By: Thomas M. Melsheimer
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: John C.C. Sanders, Jr
Represented By: Robert S. Clark
Represented By: Bradley D. Ryynanen
Represented By: Bryan S. Johansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Smith
Represented By: Lance C. Young
Represented By: Andrew J. Kochanowski
Represented By: R. Adam Swick
Represented By: J. Benjamin King
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ilardo
Represented By: Lance C. Young
Represented By: Andrew J. Kochanowski
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: R. Adam Swick
Represented By: J. Benjamin King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?