BMO Harris Bank NA v. KND Trucking et al

Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank NA
Defendant: Kevin North and KND Trucking
Case Number: 2:2018cv00624
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank NA, Defendants KND Trucking, Kevin North. Form due by 10/22/2018. (las)
October 5, 2018 9 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank NA, Defendants KND Trucking, Kevin North. (las)
October 5, 2018 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by KND Trucking, Kevin North. Attorney J. Brady Brammer added to party KND Trucking(pty:dft), Attorney J. Brady Brammer added to party Kevin North(pty:dft)(Brammer, J.)
October 1, 2018 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank NA as to KND Trucking served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Marcy, Lisa)
September 20, 2018 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank NA as to Kevin North served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Marcy, Lisa)
August 8, 2018 5 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed against the plaintiffs.. Correction: Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected.. re #2 Complaint. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to KND Trucking. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
August 8, 2018 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kevin North. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
August 7, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against KND Trucking and Kevin North (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3073346) filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Transfer Agreements, #3 Exhibit B - Loan and Security Agreement #1, #4 Exhibit C - Modification Agreement #1, #5 Exhibit D - Loan and Security Agreement #2, #6 Exhibit E - Modification Agreement #2, #7 Exhibit F - Loan and Security Agreement #3, #8 Exhibit G - Modification Agreement #3, #9 Exhibit H - Loan and Security Agreement #4, #10 Exhibit I - Modification Agreement #4, #11 Exhibit J - Loan and Security Agreement #5, #12 Exhibit K - Modification Agreement #5, #13 Exhibit L - Loan and Security Agreement #6, #14 Exhibit M - Continuing Guaranties) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Marcy, Lisa) Modified on 8/8/2018 by correcting the Complaint was filed against the Defendants (tlh).
August 7, 2018 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank NA is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank NA v. KND Trucking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin North
Represented By: J. Brady Brammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KND Trucking
Represented By: J. Brady Brammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank NA
Represented By: Lisa A. Marcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?