Vox Marketing Group v. Prodigy Promos et al
Plaintiff: Vox Marketing Group
Defendant: Tyler Fredrickson, Brooke Johns, Michael Perley, Spencer Oldson, Eric Oldson, Jason Marsh, Jeffrey Johns, Henhouse Designworks, Prodigy Promos and John Priday
Counter Defendant: Christopher Rollins, Aaron Scott, Alex Wolfe and Shane Brady
Case Number: 2:2018cv00632
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #25 filed by Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Eric Oldson, Spencer Oldson, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos, Counter Claimant Prodigy Promos (Lee, Joshua)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #25 filed by Plaintiff Vox Marketing Group (Lorimer, Brent)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/4/18. (ss)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Modification of Docket: Docket No. 23 (originally filed as document 19) has been re-filed. Please disregard docket no. 19. (jlw)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim/Third Party Complaint filed by Christopher Rollins, Vox Marketing Group, Aaron Scott, Alex Wolfe, Shane Brady.
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Eric Oldson, Spencer Oldson, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos. (las)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #19 Notice of Filing. Document should be filed as an Answer to Counterclaim, Civil Events->Answers to Complaints, edit docket text to reflect Counterclaim. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (dla)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 **PLEASE DISREGARD** THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REFILED AS DOCKET NO. 23 NOTICE OF FILING of Answer of Vox Marketing Group, LLC, Christoper S. Rollins, Alex Wolfe, Aaron Scott, and Shane Brady to Amended Counterclaim/Third Party Complaint filed by Plaintiff Vox Marketing Group. (Sumsion, Grant) Modified on 9/24/2018 by entering error text (jlw).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vox Marketing Group as to Brooke Johns served on 8/25/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Steele, Daniel)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vox Marketing Group as to Henhouse Designworks served on 8/25/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Steele, Daniel)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vox Marketing Group as to Jeffrey Johns served on 8/25/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Steele, Daniel)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET TEXT ORDER re #7 Joint MOTION for Initial Scheduling Conference and #12 MOTION for Sanctions. These Motions will not be addressed until after the time to consent has lapsed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/29/18. No attached document. (tmb)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Vox Marketing Group. NOTE- Opposition originally filed in State Court on 8/9/2018. (las)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Dean Sapp in Support re #12 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Eric Oldson, Spencer Oldson, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos. NOTE- Document originally filed in State Court on 7/26/2018. (las)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Contempt and Sanctions against VOX Marketing Group filed by Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Eric Oldson, Spencer Oldson, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos. NOTE- Motion originally filed in State Court on 7/26/2018. (las)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Eric Oldson, Spencer Oldson, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos, Plaintiff Vox Marketing Group. Form due by 9/11/2018. (las)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brooke Johns. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeffrey Johns. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Henhouse Designworks. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Initial Scheduling Conference and Stipulation Regarding Expert Disclosures filed by Defendant Prodigy Promos. (Lee, Joshua)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Vox Marketing Group. (las)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPLY BRIEF re: #12 Motion for Contempt and Sanctions to Vox Marketing Group, LLC's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Contempt and Sanctions Against Vox Marketing Group, LLC filed by Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Eric Oldson, Spencer Oldson, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos. (Inouye, Jared) Modified on 8/27/2018 added link to pending motion (las).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Michael Perley. (Lee, Joshua)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Tyler Fredrickson, Jason Marsh, Eric Oldson, Spencer Oldson, Michael Perley, John Priday, Prodigy Promos, Plaintiff Vox Marketing Group. (tlh)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th District Court Utah County, case number 160401386, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3076168) filed by Michael Perley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit 4 2d Am Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 Summons, #6 Exhibit 6 Acceptance of Service, #7 Exhibit 7 Am Answer to 2d Am Compl & Ctrclm, #8 Exhibit 8 State Case Docket, #9 Exhibit 9 Temporary Restraining Order, #10 Exhibit 10 Stipulated Order Re ESI, #11 Exhibit 11 Stipulated Protective Order, #12 Exhibit 12 Minutes Telephone Conference, #13 Exhibit 13 Order Granting Pl's MPSJ, #14 Exhibit 14 Order Granting Def's MPSJ, #15 Exhibit 15 Order Granting Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Def's MPSJ, #16 Exhibit 16 Order Classifying Objection as Private, #17 Exhibit 17 Order Granting SDI Re Authentication Credentials, #18 Exhibit 18 Order Granting SDI Re # of Interrogatories, #19 Exhibit 19 Order Denying SDI Re Zions Subpoena, #20 Exhibit 20 Order Granting SDI Re Damages & Trade Secrets, #21 Exhibit 21 Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Designate Objections, #22 Exhibit 22 Order Granting Motion to Classify as Private, #23 Exhibit 23 Order Granting Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline, #24 Exhibit 24 Order Granting Motion to Classify as Private, #25 Exhibit 25 Order Re June 20, 2018 Hearing, #26 Exhibit 26 Order to Classify as Private, #27 Exhibit 27 Order Granting Motion to Classify as Private, #28 Exhibit 28 Ruling and Order, #29 Exhibit 29 Order on Motion to Amend Complaint, #30 Exhibit 30 Motion for Contempt, #31 Exhibit 31 Sapp Declaration, #32 Exhibit 32 SDI Re Timing of Discovery, #33 Exhibit 33 Proposed Order, #34 Exhibit 34 Second SDI Re Timing of Discovery, #35 Exhibit 35 Objection to SDI, #36 Exhibit 36 Proposed Order, #37 Exhibit 37 Stipulation to Extend Expert Discovery Deadlines, #38 Exhibit 38 Opp'n to Contempt Motion) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Lee, Joshua)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendants Jason Marsh, Eric Oldson, Spencer Oldson, Michael Perley, John Priday and Prodigy Promos are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vox Marketing Group v. Prodigy Promos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Fredrickson
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Perley
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Oldson
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Oldson
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Marsh
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henhouse Designworks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Promos
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Joshua L. Lee
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Priday
Represented By: Jared L. Inouye
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vox Marketing Group
Represented By: Daniel L. Steele
Represented By: Grant M. Sumsion
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Jason S. Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Christopher Rollins
Represented By: Daniel L. Steele
Represented By: Grant M. Sumsion
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Jason S. Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Aaron Scott
Represented By: Daniel L. Steele
Represented By: Grant M. Sumsion
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Jason S. Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Alex Wolfe
Represented By: Daniel L. Steele
Represented By: Grant M. Sumsion
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Jason S. Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Shane Brady
Represented By: Daniel L. Steele
Represented By: Grant M. Sumsion
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Jason S. Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?