Cimetrix v. Systematic Designs International et al

Plaintiff: Cimetrix
Defendant: Systematic Designs International, Jen-Shih Jessi Niou, James G. Wang and Jane Niou
Case Number: 2:2018cv00633
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 10/9/2018. (las)
October 9, 2018 11 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #9 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Plaintiff Cimetrix. (Ball, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 10 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Matthew J. Ball in Support re #9 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Plaintiff Cimetrix. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Real property records, #2 Exhibit B - Corporate entity records, #3 Exhibit C - Service attempts at 1512 SE 126th Court, #4 Exhibit D - Service attempt at 11800 NE 95th Street, Suite 260)(Ball, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 9 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Plaintiff Cimetrix. Attorney Matthew J. Ball added to party Cimetrix(pty:pla)(Ball, Matthew)
August 28, 2018 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to James G. Wang. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
August 28, 2018 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jane Niou. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
August 28, 2018 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jen-Shih Jessi Niou. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
August 28, 2018 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jen-Shih Jessi Niou with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Jane Niou, James G. Wang. Removed Defendants: Systematic Designs International, Inc.. filed by Cimetrix. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint) (Hess, Gregory)
August 13, 2018 4 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Dale A. Kimball recused. Case reassigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/13/2018. (eat)
August 13, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3076792) filed by Cimetrix. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Hess, Gregory)
August 13, 2018 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff Cimetrix is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cimetrix v. Systematic Designs International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Systematic Designs International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jen-Shih Jessi Niou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Niou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cimetrix
Represented By: Gregory M. Hess
Represented By: Steven R. Glauser
Represented By: Matthew J. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?