Moreno et al v. Schindler Elevator et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Moreno and Silvia Zamora
Defendant: Kroger Co, The, Schindler Elevator and Smith's Food & Drug Center
Case Number: 2:2018cv00646
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/30/2019. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Motions due by 1/13/2020. Scheduling conference will be held for purposes of setting a trial date 1/21/2020 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Jill N. Parrish. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/9/2018. (jds)
October 4, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #15 Crossclaim of Smith's Food & Drug Center, Inc. and the Kroger Co. filed by Schindler Elevator.(Lilja, Scott)
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 Order to Show Cause, filed by Kroger Co, The, Smith's Food & Drug Center. (Edwards, Stephen)
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 Order to Show Cause, filed by Schindler Elevator. (Lilja, Scott)
September 19, 2018 Filing 16 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Morris, Nathan)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #7 Crossclaim against Smith's Food & Drug Center, CROSSCLAIM against Schindler Elevator filed by Smith's Food & Drug Center, Kroger Co, The.(Edwards, Stephen)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/11/2018. (jds)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/6/18. (ss)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #8 filed by Plaintiffs Ramon Moreno, Silvia Zamora (Morris, Nathan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #8 filed by Defendants Kroger Co, The, Smith's Food & Drug Center, Cross Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Center (Edwards, Stephen)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Defendants are hereby ORDERED to allege the domicile of each of the Plaintiffs so that the court may determine its subject matter jurisdiction by properly evaluating whether complete diversity exists in this case. Defendants are to respond accordingly by September 21, 2018. If the defendants do not respond, this court will remand the case back to state court. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/7/2018. (jds)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #8 filed by Cross Claimant Schindler Elevator, Defendant Schindler Elevator (Lilja, Scott)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/6/18. (ss)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Smith's Food & Drug Center filed by Schindler Elevator. (Lilja, Scott)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Lilja on behalf of Schindler Elevator (Lilja, Scott)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Miller Deforge on behalf of Schindler Elevator (Deforge, Nicole)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Kroger Co, The, Smith's Food & Drug Center, Plaintiffs Ramon Moreno, Silvia Zamora. (tlh)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Kroger Co, The, Smith's Food & Drug Center. (Edwards, Stephen)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Salt Lake County, case number 180905233, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3084492) filed by Smith's Food & Drug Center, Kroger Co, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Edwards, Stephen) Modified on 8/21/2018 by correcting receipt number (tlh).
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Defendants Kroger Co, The and Smith's Food & Drug Center is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno et al v. Schindler Elevator et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Moreno
Represented By: Brian C. Webber
Represented By: Nathan S. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Zamora
Represented By: Brian C. Webber
Represented By: Nathan S. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co, The
Represented By: Stephen F. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schindler Elevator
Represented By: Scott M. Lilja
Represented By: Nicole Miller Deforge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Center
Represented By: Stephen F. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?