Carrell v. Kearl et al
Plaintiff: John Carrell
Defendant: Maryann Reding, Rick Brown, FNU Ray, J. Beers, Larry Benzon, Allan Howard, FNU Gomez, Jordan Kearl, Victor Smith, Lucy Ramirez and FNU Phelps
Undetermined: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2018cv00654
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: It is therefore ordered that: Although the Court has already granted Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must still eventually pay $350.00, the full amount of the filing fee. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $85.91 within thirty days of the date of this Order, or his/her complaint will be dismissed. Plaintiff must make monthly payments of twenty percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiffs account. Plaintiff shall make the necessary arrangement to give a copy of this Order to the inmate funds accounting office at Plaintiffs correctional facility. Plaintiff shall complete the consent to collection of fees and submit it to the inmate funds accounting office at Plaintiff's correctional facility and also submit a copy of the signed consent to this Court within thirty days from the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/17/2018. (kpf)
October 11, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants on the case filed by Plaintiff John Carrell. (kpf)
October 9, 2018 Filing 26 OBJECTIONS to #24 MOTION to Stay Case, filed by John Carrell (alt)
September 26, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Fay Bradley on behalf of J. Beers, Larry Benzon, Rick Brown, FNU Gomez, Allan Howard, Jordan Kearl, FNU Phelps, Lucy Ramirez, FNU Ray, Maryann Reding, Victor Smith (Bradley, Diana)
September 26, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Defendants J. Beers, Larry Benzon, Rick Brown, FNU Gomez, Allan Howard, Jordan Kearl, FNU Phelps, Lucy Ramirez, FNU Ray, Maryann Reding, Victor Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party J. Beers(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Larry Benzon(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Rick Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party FNU Gomez(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Allan Howard(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Jordan Kearl(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party FNU Phelps(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Lucy Ramirez(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party FNU Ray(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Maryann Reding(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Victor Smith(pty:dft)(Kaiser, Kyle)
September 20, 2018 Filing 23 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Larry Benzon served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; FNU Gomez served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Allan Howard served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; FNU Phelps served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Lucy Ramirez served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Maryann Reding served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Victor Smith served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (kpf)
September 20, 2018 Filing 22 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jordan Kearl served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (back side of summons-not clear copy, but has been returned executed) (kpf)
September 20, 2018 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed as to J. Beers served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (kpf)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rick Brown served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (kpf)
September 20, 2018 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed as to FNU Ray served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (kpf)
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Lucy Ramirez. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Jordan Kearl. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to FNU Gomez. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Maryann Reding. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to FNU Phelps. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Larry Benzon. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Allan Howard. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to FNU Ray. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to J. Beers. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Victor Smith. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Rick Brown. (tlh)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for John Carrell received from Correctional Institution (alt)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Court to Accept and Recognize Legal Power of Attorney for Plaintiff's Signature filed by Plaintiff John Carrell. (tlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2018: #1 Exhibit Power of Attorney) (tlh).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 08/27/2018. (tlh)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff John Carrell. (tlh)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Originally received by the court on 08/21/2018). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by John Carrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (tlh)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 08/27/2018. (tlh)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 8/21/2018) filed by Plaintiff John Carrell. (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrell v. Kearl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryann Reding
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Brown
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ray
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Beers
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Benzon
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Howard
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Gomez
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Kearl
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Smith
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Ramirez
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Phelps
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?