She v. Health Line International Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Limin She
Defendant: Gloria Faulkner, Estrella Medical LLC, Health Line International, IMSI Medical, Aaron Faulkner, Joel Faulkner and Elliot Faulkner
Case Number: 2:2018cv00681
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, Health Line International, IMSI Medical of Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Ekins, Brett)
October 23, 2018 Filing 67 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-P) (Gargano, Brian)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/22/18 (alt)
October 13, 2018 Filing 65 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Amended Verified Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Counter Defendant Limin She, Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Verified Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B)(Gargano, Brian)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2019-pla, 1/28/2019-dfts. Expert Discovery due by 9/15/2019. Motions due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/10/18 (alt)
October 10, 2018 Filing 63 ADDENDUM to #62 Attorney Planning Meeting filed by Counter Defendant Limin She, Plaintiff Limin She Proposed Scheduling Order. (Gargano, Brian)
October 10, 2018 Filing 62 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Gargano, Brian)
September 28, 2018 Filing 61 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Limin She as to Health Line International served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Johansen, Bryan)
September 19, 2018 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical. (Shields, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2018 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical. (Shields, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2018 Filing 58 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Health Line International. (tlh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 57 **SEALED DOCUMENT** Sealed Exhibit A re #48 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Limin SheNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Johansen, Bryan) Modified on 9/13/2018: clarified text, removed incorrect party role selection & linked to underlying motion (alt)
September 13, 2018 Filing 56 ANSWER to #38 Counterclaim filed by Limin She.(Gargano, Brian)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot #4 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/12/18 (alt)
September 12, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #52 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION for Leave to Filed Sealed Document. The main document is a copy of a motion already granted and not sealed. Filer was to format the document they were granted leave to file as a separate document with DUCivR 10 complaint cover page captioned to indicate exactly what it is and file that document as a "Sealed Document", linked to the entry it should be an exhibit to. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the correct document using the correct filing event. The new entry will receive a new document number on the docket. (alt)
September 11, 2018 Filing 53 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Addressing the Juliu Agreement filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical. (Shields, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2018 Filing 52 ERROR: NOT A SEALED MOTION - *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION for Leave to Filed Sealed Document re 50 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document, #49 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #48 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, and Memorandum in Support (NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties) filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Juliu Agreement (Chinese))(Johansen, Bryan) Modified on 9/12/2018: error text added (alt)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER STRIKING HEARING-As a result of the plaintiff Dr. Shes inability to appear in person, the hearing scheduled for September 17, 2018, is stricken. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/10/18. (jmr)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 09/10/2018. No attached document. (aer)
September 7, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #48 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Agreement)(Johansen, Bryan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 48 Redacted REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Copy of Untranslated Agreement), #2 Exhibit B (Arbitration Document))(Johansen, Bryan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tena Campbell: Status Conference held on 9/5/2018. Counsel are present. Mr. Brian Gargano appears telephonically. The court informs the parties that it is going to deny the motion for temporary restraining order and will instead hold an expedited preliminary injunction hearing. Plaintiff is to file a reply memorandum by the end of business Friday, 9/7/2018. Defendants are to file a supplemental brief or memorandum by Tuesday, 9/11/2018, addressing specifically the agreement between Dr. She and Juliu. The evidentiary hearing is set for 9/17/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are to have their affiants, including Dr. She, present for cross examination. Counsel are to contact chambers on Friday, 9/14/2018 for the courtroom assignment. Counsel for Plaintiff: Brian Gargano, Jonathan O. Hafen and Bryan S. Johansen. Counsel for Defendant Health Line International Corporation: Stephen P. Horvat. Counsel for all remaining Defendants: Jeffrey Weston Shields and Brennan Curtis. Court Reporter: Karen Murakami. (cff)
September 5, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake D. Miller on behalf of Health Line International (Miller, Blake)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/5/18 (alt)
September 5, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan S. Johansen on behalf of Limin She (Johansen, Bryan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by chambers) Status Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 04:00 PM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Tena Campbell. Out of State counsel may call into the courtroom for this hearing. If more than one party is calling in, it will be necessary for all parties appearing telephonically to join on one call and then call into the courtroom at (801) 907-4000 a few minutes prior to the hearing. Please contact Chris Ford at (801) 524-6170 if you have questions. (cff)
September 4, 2018 Filing 42 After review of the case, case reassigned to District Judge per 37 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian Gargano for Limin She,Brian Gargano for Limin She. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/4/2018. (las)
August 31, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian Gargano , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3094162, filed by Counter Defendant Limin She, Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B-ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C-Proposed Order PHV)(Hafen, Jonathan)
August 31, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan O. Hafen on behalf of Limin She (Hafen, Jonathan)
August 30, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Limin She filed by Elliot Faulkner, Aaron Faulkner, Estrella Medical LLC, Gloria Faulkner, IMSI Medical, Joel Faulkner.(Shields, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE REASSIGNMENT. This case was recently transferred from another district and assigned to Magistrate Judge Pead. However, pursuant to court policy, Plaintiff's pending motion for immediate injunctive relief (see #2 and #4 ) render this case ineligible for consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Accordingly, the court orders that this case be reassigned to a district court judge through the random reassignment process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/30/2018. (amn)
August 30, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, Health Line International, IMSI Medical, Plaintiff Limin She. Form due by 9/14/2018. (rks)
August 30, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, Health Line International, IMSI Medical, Plaintiff Limin She. (rks)
August 30, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Robert Carl Jarosh, Traci L. Lacock, for Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical (rks)
August 30, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Deborah G. Muirhead Kellam, Lance E. Shurtleff, for Defendant Health Line International (rks)
August 30, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Brian Gargano, Danielle M. Mathey, for Plaintiff Limin She (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice - Mathey) (rks)
August 30, 2018 Filing 31 Case transferred in from USDC of Wyoming; Case Number 1:18-cv-00135. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead.
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #15 Motion to transfer case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah and deferring ruling on #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The hearing set for 8/30/18 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED.(Court Staff, sal) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 29 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Limin She. Estrella Medical LLC served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; Aaron Faulkner served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; Elliot Faulkner served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; Gloria Faulkner served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; Joel Faulkner served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018; IMSI Medical Inc served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Johansen, Bryan) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah G Muirhead Kellam on behalf of Health Line International Corporation (Kellam, Deborah) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Mathey, Danielle) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 26 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - ERRATA re #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mathey, Danielle) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mathey, Danielle) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant Health Line International Corporation. (Horvat, Stephen) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Lacock, Traci) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #19 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Stephen P Horvat for Health Line International Corporation (Court Staff, sal) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #12 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Timothy B Anderson for Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner and IMSI Medical Inc; granting #13 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Brett D Ekins for Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner and IMSI Medical Inc; and granting #14 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jeffrey W Shields for Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner and IMSI Medical Inc(Court Staff, sal) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support of #15 MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah filed by Defendant Health Line International Corporation. (Shurtleff, Lance) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Stephen P. Horvat to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Health Line International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen P. Horvat, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(Shurtleff, Lance) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance E Shurtleff on behalf of Health Line International Corporation (Shurtleff, Lance) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 17 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER Setting Schedule for #15 Motion to Change Venue to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. It is ordered that Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Change Venue #15 on or before August 28, 2018. It is further ordered that the Court will hold a hearing on the Motion to Change Venue #15 on 8/30/2018 at 09:00 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sjgc) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. REQUEST for Hearing re #15 MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacock, Traci) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacock, Traci) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2018: #2 Exhibits) (Court Staff, sjlg). [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jeffrey W. Shields to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacock, Traci) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Brett D. Ekins to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacock, Traci) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Timothy B. Anderson to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lacock, Traci) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Traci L Lacock on behalf of Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc (Lacock, Traci) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Carl Jarosh on behalf of Estrella Medical LLC, Aaron Faulkner, Elliot Faulkner, Gloria Faulkner, Joel Faulkner, IMSI Medical Inc (Jarosh, Robert) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Barbara Nickels-Smith Concerning Service filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Mathey, Danielle) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Bryan S. Johansen for Plaintiff Dr. Limin She and #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Brian Gargano for Plaintiff Dr. Limin She by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin(Court Staff, szf) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Brian Gargano to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathey, Danielle) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Schedule for #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. It is ordered that Defendants shall respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before August 27, 2018. It is further ordered that the Court will hold a hearing on the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 8/30/2018 at 09:00 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. It is finally ordered that Plaintiff shall provide Defendants with prompt notice of this order. Failure to ensure Defendants' have prompt notice of this Order will result in the Court vacating the briefing schedule. (Court Staff, sjlg) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Bryan S. Johansen to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Mathey, Danielle) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing on #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mathey, Danielle) Modified on 8/17/2018 (Court Staff, sal). Modified text on 8/17/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg). [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mathey, Danielle) Modified text on 8/17/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg). [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Limin She. (Mathey, Danielle). Added MOTION relief and changed text on 8/17/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg). [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT (No summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002100.), filed by Limin She. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A-P) (Court Staff, stbd) [Transferred from Wyoming on 8/30/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: She v. Health Line International Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Faulkner
Represented By: Brett D. Ekins
Represented By: Timothy B. Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Weston Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrella Medical LLC
Represented By: Brett D. Ekins
Represented By: Timothy B. Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Weston Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Line International
Represented By: Stephen P. Horvat
Represented By: Blake D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMSI Medical
Represented By: Brett D. Ekins
Represented By: Timothy B. Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Weston Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Faulkner
Represented By: Brett D. Ekins
Represented By: Timothy B. Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Weston Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Faulkner
Represented By: Brett D. Ekins
Represented By: Timothy B. Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Weston Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Faulkner
Represented By: Brett D. Ekins
Represented By: Timothy B. Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Weston Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limin She
Represented By: Bryan S. Johansen
Represented By: Brian Gargano
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?