Truth About Proposition 2 et al v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Bruce H. Wooley, Walter J. Plumb, III, Arthur Brown, Bruce F. Rigby and Truth About Proposition 2
Defendant: Curtis Koch, State of Utah, The and Spencer J. Cox
Intervenor: Utah Patients Coalition
Case Number: 2:2018cv00702
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Referring Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Curtis Kock by Walter J. Plumb, III. (Melrose, Kenneth)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Joint #22 Motion Requesting Stay of all Proceedings. All proceedings in this case are stayed, including all briefing deadlines and discovery obligations, pending the results of the Utah General Election on November 6, 2018. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/16/18. (jmr)
October 15, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION Requesting Stay of all Proceedings Joint Motion and Order filed by Plaintiff Walter J. Plumb, III. (Melrose, Kenneth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 21 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #15 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Walter J. Plumb, III. (Melrose, Kenneth)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION-denying #16 Motion to Shorten Time on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants may file an opposition to Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion within fourteen (14) days of service of the Motion. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/5/18. (jmr)
October 4, 2018 Filing 19 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Spencer J. Cox, State of Utah, The. (Dymek, Andrew)
October 4, 2018 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to District Judge per 17 Docket Text Order for Case to be Reassigned. Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups and Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (jwt)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. In light of the motion for preliminary injunction that has been filed #15 , the court has determined that this case should be reassigned to a district judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 10/4/18. No attached document. (mjw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Walter J. Plumb, III. (Melrose, Kenneth)
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Walter J. Plumb, III. (Melrose, Kenneth)
September 24, 2018 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendants Spencer J. Cox, State of Utah, The. (Dymek, Andrew)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 9/24/2018. (las)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Defendants Spencer J. Cox, State of Utah, The. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant State of Utah and Spencer J. Cox's Motion for Leave to file Overlength Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Dymek, Andrew)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 9/12/2018. (las)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Spencer J. Cox, State of Utah, The. NOTE- Answer originally filed in State Court on 9/5/2018. (las)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 File Received from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County consisting of docket sheet and documents filed in state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Amended complaint, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Notice of Appearance, #8 Answer, #9 Notice of Due Dates, #10 Notice of Removal) (las)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Spencer J. Cox, State of Utah, The. (las)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Utah Patients Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Gerald M. Salcido added to party Utah Patients Coalition(pty:mov)(Salcido, Gerald)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Arthur Brown, Walter J. Plumb, III, Bruce F. Rigby, Truth About Proposition 2, Bruce H. Wooley, Defendants Spencer J. Cox, Curtis Koch, State of Utah, The. Form due by 9/21/2018. (nl)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Arthur Brown, Walter J. Plumb, III, Bruce F. Rigby, Truth About Proposition 2, Bruce H. Wooley, Defendants Spencer J. Cox, Curtis Koch, State of Utah, The. (nl)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Michael L. Farley and Kenneth J. Jorgensen, for Plaintiffs Walter J. Plumb, III, Bruce F. Rigby, Truth About Proposition 2, Bruce H. Wooley. (nl)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District Court Salt Lake County, State of Utah, case number 180905858, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3096843) filed by Spencer J. Cox, State of Utah, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Waiver of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint with Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Amended Complaint with Exhibits, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Appearance (Combined), #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Lt. Governor Cox's Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Notice of Event Due Dates (Automatically generated by State Court), #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Certificate of Service (Notice of Removal)) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Dymek, Andrew)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Defendant Spencer J. Cox is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truth About Proposition 2 et al v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce H. Wooley
Represented By: Kenneth J. Melrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter J. Plumb, III
Represented By: Kenneth J. Melrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Brown
Represented By: Kenneth J. Melrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce F. Rigby
Represented By: Kenneth J. Melrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truth About Proposition 2
Represented By: Kenneth J. Melrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Koch
Represented By: Neal C. Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah, The
Represented By: Andrew Dymek
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer J. Cox
Represented By: Andrew Dymek
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Utah Patients Coalition
Represented By: Gerald M. Salcido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?