National Public Radio et al v. United States Department of Labor et al
Plaintiff: National Public Radio and Howard Berkes
Defendant: Mine Safety and Health Administration and United States Department of Labor
Case Number: 2:2018cv00723
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause appearing, the Court extends the deadline for Defendants Mine Safety and Health Administration and United States Department of Labor to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Mine Safety and Health Administration answer due 12/5/2018; United States Department of Labor answer due 12/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/5/2018. No attached document. (nas)
November 2, 2018 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Mine Safety and Health Administration, United States Department of Labor. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Berndt, Amanda)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/22/18. (dla)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Mine Safety and Health Administration answer due 11/5/2018; United States Department of Labor answer due 11/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/15/2018. (las)
October 13, 2018 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Mine Safety and Health Administration, United States Department of Labor. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Attorney Amanda A. Berndt added to party Mine Safety and Health Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda A. Berndt added to party United States Department of Labor(pty:dft)(Berndt, Amanda)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/1/2018. (mjm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Complaint served on US Department of Labor c/o US Attorney John Huber on 09/14/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Howard Berkes, National Public Radio. (Gaylord, Mark)
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Complaint served on Mine Safety and Heath Administration c/o US Attorney John Huber on 09/14/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Howard Berkes, National Public Radio. (Gaylord, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Kelley for Howard Berkes,Matthew E. Kelley for National Public Radio. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/19/18. (dla)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Jeremy Bodney for Howard Berkes,David Jeremy Bodney for National Public Radio. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/19/18. (dla)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Kelley , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3106749, filed by Plaintiffs Howard Berkes, National Public Radio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - CM/ECF Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Gaylord, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Jeremy Bodney , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3106721, filed by Plaintiffs Howard Berkes, National Public Radio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - CM/ECF Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Gaylord, Mark)
September 14, 2018 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Mine Safety and Health Administration answer due 10/14/2018 per #12 Return of Service; United States Department of Labor answer due 10/14/2018 per #13 Return of Service. (rks)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of Labor. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mine Safety and Health Administration. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney David J. Bodney, for Plaintiffs Howard Berkes and National Public Radio. (tlh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mine Safety and Health Administration. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of Labor. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Mine Safety and Health Administration, United States Department of Labor (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3102544) filed by National Public Radio, Howard Berkes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request A, #2 Exhibit 2 - Charboneau Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Administrative Appeal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Request B, #5 Exhibit 5 - Hafeez Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Second Administrative Appeal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet for New Case) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Gaylord, Mark)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiffs Howard Berkes, National Public Radio is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Public Radio et al v. United States Department of Labor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety and Health Administration
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Public Radio
Represented By: Mark R. Gaylord
Represented By: David Jeremy Bodney
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Berkes
Represented By: Mark R. Gaylord
Represented By: David Jeremy Bodney
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?