Unlimited Ventures Utah et al v. Moreno et al
Plaintiff: Scarlett Menjivar, Josue Ramirez and Unlimited Ventures Utah
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Luis Alejandro Moreno and Erika Miranda
3Rd Party Defendant: Utah Key Real Estate, Samuel Rangel and Sergio Romecin
Case Number: 2:2018cv00737
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been remanded to Third District Court, West Jordan, via Mail. Remand Letter, Order, and Docket Sheet sent. (las)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand. This action is hereby remanded to the Third Judicial District Court in and for Salt Lake County, State of Utah, Unlimited Ventures Utah, LLC et al. v. Moreno et al., Civil No. 180402784 EV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/19/2018. (las)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION to Remand to 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, State of Utah filed by ThirdParty Defendant Utah Key Real Estate. (McDonald, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/18/2018. (las)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Third party complaint filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Erika Miranda, Luis Alejandro Moreno. NOTE- Originally filed is State Court on 9/17/2018. (las)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 File Received from Third District Court, West Jordan, Salt Lake County consisting of docket sheet and documents filed in state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibits, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Proof of Service, #6 Answer to Counterclaim, #7 Exhibits, #8 Exhibits, #9 Lis Pendens, #10 Request for Hearing, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C - J, #14 Exhibit K-M, #15 Exhibit N-P, #16 Motion, #17 Affidavit, #18 Motion, #19 Notice to serve subpoena, #20 Affidavit, #21 Return of Service, #22 Return of Service, #23 Return of Service, #24 Return of Service, #25 Notice, #26 Return of Service, #27 Notice of appearance, #28 Answer, #29 Opposition, #30 Exhibits, #31 Exhibits, #32 Exhibits, #33 Exhibits, #34 Exhibits, #35 Exhibits, #36 Exhibits, #37 Exhibits, #38 Exhibits, #39 Motion, #40 Proposed Order, #41 Reply, #42 Request, #43 Request, #44 Opposition, #45 Response, #46 Order, #47 Order, #48 Notice of Appearance, #49 Motion to Dismiss, #50 Notice of Appearance, #51 Motion to Dismiss, #52 Joinder, #53 Motion, #54 Sur Memorandum, #55 Motion) (las)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 File Received from Third District Court, West Jordan, Salt Lake County consisting of Documents filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Request to Submit, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Exhibit 5-8, #4 Exhibit 9-11, #5 Exhibit 12-14, #6 Exhibit 15-22, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Motion, #10 Defendant Statement, #11 Exhibit, #12 Rule 37, #13 Objection, #14 Request, #15 Motion, #16 Request, #17 Exhibit 1, #18 Exhibit 2, #19 Exhibit 3, #20 Exhibit 4, #21 Exhibit 5, #22 Exhibit 6, #23 Motion, #24 Notice of Joinder, #25 Request, #26 Supplement Sur reply, #27 Memorandum, #28 Order, #29 Order, #30 Reply Memorandum, #31 Request, #32 Memorandum, #33 Request, #34 Consent to law student, #35 Consent to law student, #36 law student certification, #37 Order, #38 Exhibit A, #39 Objection, #40 proposed order, #41 certificate of service, #42 proposed order, #43 statement of discovery, #44 Amended Complaint and Third Party Complaint, #45 Order, #46 Order, #47 Notice of Dismissal of Third Party Complaint) (las)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Scarlett Menjivar, Josue Ramirez, Unlimited Ventures Utah, Defendants Erika Miranda, Luis Alejandro Moreno, Third Party Defendants Samuel Rangel, Sergio Romecin. Form due by 10/3/2018. (rks)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Scarlett Menjivar, Josue Ramirez, Unlimited Ventures Utah, Defendants Erika Miranda, Luis Alejandro Moreno, Third Party Defendants Samuel Rangel, Sergio Romecin. (rks)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Samuel Rangel, Sergio Romecin, Utah Key Real Estate filed by Luis Alejandro Moreno, Erika Miranda. (Filed in State Court) (rks)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Utah Key Real Estate, Samuel Rangel, Sergio Romecin, COUNTERCLAIM against Scarlett Menjivar, Josue Ramirez, Unlimited Ventures Utah filed by Luis Alejandro Moreno, Erika Miranda. (Filed in State Court) (rks) Modified by clarifying this was from state court on 9/18/2018 (rks).
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Dismissal of Federal Question Claim in State Court Matter by Luis Alejandro Moreno re #2 Notice of Removal,,,, #1 Remark - New Case, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Dismissal in State Action, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket showing dismissal) (Shumway, Douglas)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180402784, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3104230) filed by Utah Key Real Estate. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (Complaint), #3 Exhibit 2 (Answer and Counterclaim), #4 Exhibit 3 (Order on Utah Key Real Estate, LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings), #5 Exhibit 4 (Order Re: September 10, 2018 Telephonic Hearing), #6 Exhibit 5 (First Amended Third Party Complaint), #7 Exhibit 6 (Case Docket), #8 Exhibit 7 (Return of Service on UKRE), #9 Exhibit 8 (Order Following July 3, 2018 Hearing), #10 Exhibit 9 (Order - Overlength Memorandum), #11 Exhibit 10 (Order on Motion for Extension of Time), #12 Exhibit 11 (Order - Overlength Memorandum), #13 Exhibit 12 (Order Granting Sipulated Motion to Continue August 22, 2018 Hearing), #14 Exhibit 13 (Order on Defendants' Statement of Discovery Issues), #15 Exhibit 14 (Order on Statement of Discovery Issues Seeking Protection from Disclosure)) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (McDonald, Daniel)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. ThirdParty Defendant Utah Key Real Estate is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unlimited Ventures Utah et al v. Moreno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Luis Alejandro Moreno
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Represented By: Douglas C. Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Erika Miranda
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Represented By: Douglas C. Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarlett Menjivar
Represented By: Thomas Ryan McCosh
Represented By: Justin D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas Ryan McCosh
Represented By: Justin D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unlimited Ventures Utah
Represented By: Thomas Ryan McCosh
Represented By: Justin D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Utah Key Real Estate
Represented By: Daniel J. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Samuel Rangel
Represented By: Thomas Ryan McCosh
Represented By: Justin D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sergio Romecin
Represented By: Thomas Ryan McCosh
Represented By: Justin D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?