Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bramlette et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Private Placement Capital Notes II, Pelorus Group, The, James Thomas Bramlette, Stone Mountain Equities, Entelecus Fund, Aaron John Wernli, Anthony Mark Hartman and Travis Kozlowski
Case Number: 2:2018cv00761
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #26 Plaintiff's MOTION for Initial Scheduling Conference and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2018 at 01:30 PM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (lnp)
November 14, 2018 Filing 26 Plaintiff's MOTION for Initial Scheduling Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Bulgozdy, John)
October 24, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Coombs on behalf of Entelecus Fund, Travis Kozlowski (Coombs, J.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Stone Mountain Equities Waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Bulgozdy, John)
October 22, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Private Placement Capital Notes II Waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Bulgozdy, John)
October 22, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Anthony Mark Hartman Waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Bulgozdy, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 21 ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Entelecus Fund Waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Bulgozdy, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 20 ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Travis Kozlowski Waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Bulgozdy, John)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to James Thomas Bramlette Waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Bulgozdy, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 18 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Aaron John Wernli. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/4/18. (dla)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/2/2018. (jwt)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/1/2018. (mjm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 After review of case, case reassigned to District Judge per 12 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa M. Melson on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Melson, Theresa)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Bulgozdy on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Bulgozdy, John)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Plaintiff filed #3 CONSENT TO ENTRY of Final Judgment as to Defendant Aaron John Wernli, which is ripe for decision. Because all defendants have not yet been served or appeared, consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge by all parties is not possible at this time. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/27/2018. (docket text order, no attached document). (abs)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Aaron John Wernli. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Entelecus Fund. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Travis Kozlowski. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Stone Mountain Equities. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Private Placement Capital Notes II. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Anthony Mark Hartman. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Pelorus Group, The. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to James Thomas Bramlette. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 CONSENT TO ENTRY of Final Judgment as to Defendant Aaron John Wernli filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Final Judgment as to Defendant Aaron John Wernli)(Oliver, Amy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants No Filing Fee filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Oliver, Amy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bramlette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Placement Capital Notes II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelorus Group, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thomas Bramlette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Mountain Equities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entelecus Fund
Represented By: J. Michael Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron John Wernli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Mark Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Kozlowski
Represented By: J. Michael Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Amy J. Oliver
Represented By: John B. Bulgozdy
Represented By: Theresa M. Melson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?