Lommatzsch v. Tesla Inc et al
Plaintiff: Heather P. Lommatzsch
Defendant: Service King Paint & Body, Tesla Motors UT and Tesla Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00775
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tesla Inc Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Berard, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Correct Hearing Date: 10-Day Jury Trial reset for 8/3/2020 at 08:00 AM in Rm 7.300 before Judge David Nuffer per #25 Scheduling Order (alt)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/19/19-pla, 6/19/2019-dfts. Joinder of Parties due by 3/19/19-pla, 4/19/2019-dfts. Expert Discovery due by 4/10/2020. Motions due by 5/25/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 02:30 PM in Rm 7.300 before Judge David Nuffer. 10-Day Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 at 08:00 AM in Rm 7.300 before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/9/18 (alt) Modified on 11/13/2018: corrected Jury Trial Date (alt)
November 9, 2018 Filing 24 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chingas, George)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DOCKET TEXT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. The parties have not complied with the directives of DUCivP 16-1(e) in that their stipulated Attorney Planning Meeting Report does not contain a Proposed Scheduling Order in the required format. This form can be accessed through the hyperlinks contained at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/civil-case-scheduling. No attached document Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on November 9, 2018. (yd)
November 8, 2018 Filing 22 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Chingas, George)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 10/15/18 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Tesla Inc. (las)
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Heather P. Lommatzsch. (las)
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #7 ) with Jury Demand filed by Tesla Inc. (Fowler, Tracy) Modified on 10/15/2018: removed unnecessary text (alt)
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Service King Paint & Body. (Monson, Smith)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Service King Paint & Body. (las)
October 11, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Heather P. Lommatzsch, Defendants Service King Paint & Body, Tesla Inc. Form due by 10/26/2018. (las)
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Tesla Motors UT, Inc. with Prejudice by Tesla Inc. (Fowler, Tracy)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas P. Branigan for Tesla Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/10/2018. (las)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Berard for Tesla Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/10/2018. (las)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 File Received from Third District Court, Salt Lake County. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Return of Service, #3 Return of Service, #4 Return of Service, #5 Answer, #6 Notice of Events due, #7 Notice of Removal) (las)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas P. Branigan , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3118966, filed by Defendant Tesla Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission PHV, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fowler, Tracy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew G. Berard , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3118962, filed by Defendant Tesla Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission PHV, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for PHV)(Fowler, Tracy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Amended NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180906449, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3117939) filed by Tesla Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings_state court docket, #2 Exhibit B - Emails, #3 Exhibit C - Purchase Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - UT New MV Dealer License, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Fowler, Tracy) Modified on 10/5/2018 added Amended to the text and corrected receipt number (las).
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Thomas P. Branigan and Metthew G. Berard, for Defendant Tesla Inc. (nl)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Service King Paint & Body.(nl)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Heather P. Lommatzsch, Defendants Service King Paint & Body, Tesla Inc. (nl)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Tesla Inc. (Fowler, Tracy)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180906449, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3117939) filed by Tesla Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings_state court docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Fowler, Tracy) Modified on 10/4/2018 to correct receipt number (nl).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant Tesla Inc is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lommatzsch v. Tesla Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service King Paint & Body
Represented By: Heinz J. Mahler
Represented By: Smith D. Monson
Represented By: Gary T. Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors UT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Inc
Represented By: Kristen J. Overton
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Represented By: Matthew G. Berard
Represented By: Thomas P. Branigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather P. Lommatzsch
Represented By: Jeffery C. Metler
Represented By: George L. Chingas, Jr.
Represented By: Trevor Franklin Berrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?