Graves v. Walmart et al

Plaintiff: Elinor Graves
Defendant: WalMart Market 3988, Wal-Mart Neighborhood Market, Wal-Mart, Walmart and WalMart Real Estate Business Trust
Case Number: 2:2018cv00776
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 Modification of Docket: Error: Page 2 of the Order was not attached when originally filed. Correction: Added a copy of the full order to the docket entry. re #11 Scheduling Order. (las)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 8/31/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/18/2019. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 11/13/2018. (las) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #1 Correct Order) (las).
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Status and Scheduling Conference held on 11/8/2018. Detailed minute entry to follow pending Judge Jenkins' approval. Attorney for Plaintiff: Michael Banks, Attorney for Defendant: Andrea Keysar. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 10:34:02, Time End: 10:46:59, Room 7.200.)(las)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Scheduling Conference held on 11/1/2018. Counsel for the Plaintiff is not present. Discussion heard as to scheduling. Because of the absence of the plaintiff, this matter will be continued. Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 10:30 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Attorney for Plaintiff: Not Present, Attorney for Defendant: Andrea M. Keysar. Court Reporter: Phobe Moorhead.(kpf)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Rice, Mitchel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Wal-Mart. (Rice, Mitchel)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 File Received from 7th District Court Price, Carbon County consisting of docket sheet and documents filed in state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Return of Service) (las)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 01:20 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wal-Mart.(Rice, Mitchel)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Elinor Graves, Defendants Wal-Mart, Wal-Mart Neighborhood Market, WalMart Market 3988, WalMart Real Estate Business Trust and Walmart. (tlh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3118007) filed by Wal-Mart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons_Return of Service) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (Rice, Mitchel)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Defendants Wal-Mart, Wal-Mart Neighborhood Market, WalMart Market 3988, WalMart Real Estate Business Trust and Walmart is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves v. Walmart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Market 3988
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Neighborhood Market
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elinor Graves
Represented By: Michael L. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?