Monther v. Lough et al

Plaintiff: Henry Monther
Defendant: Willie C. Bogan, Polarityte, Denver Lough, John Stetson, Michael Beeghley, Steven Gorlin, Edward Swanson, Jeff Dyer and Jon Mogford
Case Number: 2:2018cv00791
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay pending rulings in other cases filed as class actions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 11/26/18 (alt)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Richard Menssen on behalf of Michael Beeghley, Willie C. Bogan, Jeff Dyer, Steven Gorlin, Denver Lough, Jon Mogford, Polarityte, John Stetson, Edward Swanson (Menssen, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Polarityte. (Black, Kenneth)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Action and Related Matters filed by Defendants Michael Beeghley, Willie C. Bogan, Jeff Dyer, Steven Gorlin, Denver Lough, Jon Mogford, Polarityte, John Stetson, Edward Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Kenneth B. Black added to party Michael Beeghley(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth B. Black added to party Willie C. Bogan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth B. Black added to party Jeff Dyer(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth B. Black added to party Steven Gorlin(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth B. Black added to party Denver Lough(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth B. Black added to party Jon Mogford(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth B. Black added to party Polarityte(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth B. Black added to party John Stetson(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth B. Black added to party Edward Swanson(pty:dft)(Black, Kenneth)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Timothy W. Brown, for Plaintiff Henry Monther. (nl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Phillip Kim, for Plaintiff Henry Monther. (nl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Modification of Docket: Error: Counsel submitted a new complaint to the Court by email on 10/09/2018, but did not e-file the complaint or pay the e-filing until 10/10/2018. Correction: The filing date has been changed to 10/10/2018 to reflect the date the fee was actually paid and the complaint and coversheet filed re #2 Complaint. (nl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3120743) filed by Henry Monther. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (James, Mark)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Henry Monther is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monther v. Lough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie C. Bogan
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polarityte
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Lough
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stetson
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beeghley
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Gorlin
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Swanson
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Dyer
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Mogford
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Monther
Represented By: Mark F James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?