Greenhalgh v. Walmart
Plaintiff: Janice Marlene Greenhalgh
Defendant: Walmart
Case Number: 2:2018cv00794
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/19/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/19/2019. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Motions due by 3/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/30/2018. (las)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Rice, Mitchel)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Janice Marlene Greenhalgh, Defendant Walmart. (las)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Janice Marlene Greenhalgh. (las)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 File Received from Third District Court, Salt Lake County consisting of docket sheet and documents filed in state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Return of Service) (las)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/11/2018. (las)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Walmart. (las)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Walmart.(Rice, Mitchel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Janice Marlene Greenhalgh, Defendant Walmart. Form due by 10/26/2018. (tlh)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Janice Marlene Greenhalgh, Defendant Walmart. (tlh)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3121581) filed by Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Rice, Mitchel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant Walmart is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenhalgh v. Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Marlene Greenhalgh
Represented By: Dustin Lance
Represented By: Jessica A. Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Marianne Schumann
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?