RK Solutions et al v. Equinox Nutraceuticals

Plaintiff: RK Solutions and VND Butyrate
Defendant: Equinox Nutraceuticals
Case Number: 2:2018cv00797
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 25 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Equinox Nutraceuticals. (las)
December 5, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Equinox Nutraceuticals, Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. Form due by 12/20/2018. (las)
December 5, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Equinox Nutraceuticals, Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (las)
December 5, 2018 Filing 22 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Equinox Nutraceuticals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No 6,380,244, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment History for US Patent No 6,613,356)(Miller, Mark)
December 5, 2018 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Equinox Nutraceuticals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - File History for US Pat No. 6,613,356)(Miller, Mark)
December 5, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot James Hales on behalf of Equinox Nutraceuticals (Hales, Elliot)
December 5, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Miller on behalf of Equinox Nutraceuticals (Miller, Mark)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/27/2019. Discovery due by 9/11/2019. Motions due by 9/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/27/2018. (las)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Patent Case Scheduling Order)(Hatch, Ryan)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Equinox Nutraceuticals answer due 12/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/29/2018. (las)
October 29, 2018 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time)(Swensen, Lara)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/23/2018. (las)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rownnakete Barnes for RK Solutions,Rownnakete Barnes for VND Butyrate. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/17/2018. (las)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan E. Hatch for RK Solutions,Ryan E. Hatch for VND Butyrate. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/17/2018. (las)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ethan J. Brown for RK Solutions,Ethan J. Brown for VND Butyrate. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/17/2018. (las)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan E. Hatch , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3125778, filed by Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - CM/ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hatch, Brent)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ethan J. Brown , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3125770, filed by Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - CM/ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hatch, Brent)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rowennakete Barnes , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3125760, filed by Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - CM/ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hatch, Brent)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate identifying Compound Solutions, Inc. and Axcess Blobal Sciences, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Swensen, Lara)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Equinox Nutraceuticals. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Ethn J. Brown and Rowennakete Barnes, for Plaintiffs RK Solutions and VND Butyrate (tlh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Ryan E. Hatch, for Plaintiffs RK Solutions and VND Butyrate (tlh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Equinox Nutraceuticals (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3122548) filed by VND Butyrate, RK Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '356 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - BHB Products, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Swensen, Lara)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs RK Solutions abd VND Butyrate are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RK Solutions et al v. Equinox Nutraceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RK Solutions
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: Lara A. Swensen
Represented By: Rowennakete P. Barnes
Represented By: Ryan E. Hatch
Represented By: Ethan J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VND Butyrate
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: Lara A. Swensen
Represented By: Rowennakete P. Barnes
Represented By: Ryan E. Hatch
Represented By: Ethan J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinox Nutraceuticals
Represented By: Elliot James Hales
Represented By: Mark A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?