Taylor v. Jenkins et al
Undetermined: Bankruptcy Clerk's Office
Appellant: Rickie L. Taylor
Appellee: Jill Kendall, Robert G. Harding and Lon Jenkins
Interested Party: Jeana Vuksinick and Gulf Funding
Case Number: 2:2018cv00804
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Stipulated #19 Motion to Dismiss. Case Closed. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the above-captioned appeal be and hereby is dismissed; each party will pay its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/26/18. (jmr)
November 20, 2018 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss filed by Appellant Rickie L. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toscano, Paul)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying #17 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Part VIII of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure deals with appeals to the district court. Bankruptcy Rule 8023 governs the voluntary dismissal of appeals. That rule provides that "[t]he clerk of the district court... must dismiss an appeal if the parties file a signed dismissal agreement specifying how costs are to be paid and pay any fees that are due." The Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of Appeal, (ECF No. 17) does not specify how costs are to be paid. The Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of Appeal is DENIED without prejudice. The parties are respectfully instructed to re-file a Stipulated Motion for Dismissal that specifies how costs are to be paid. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/19/2018. No attached document. (ncw)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Appellant Rickie L. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal of Appeal)(Toscano, Paul)
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Appeal The Harding Trust Creditors' Request to Submit for Decision on Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by Appellee Jill Kendall. (Bergman, Steven)
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Appellee Lon Jenkins. (Jenkins, Lon)
November 5, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Appeal The Harding Trust Creditors' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by Appellee Jill Kendall. (Bergman, Steven)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Appellee Lon Jenkins. (Jenkins, Lon)
November 4, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Appeal filed by Appellant Rickie L. Taylor. (Toscano, Paul)
November 4, 2018 Filing 11 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Appellant Rickie L. Taylor. (Toscano, Paul)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST for Oral Argument re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support and Statement of Interested Parties filed by Appellee Lon Jenkins. (Jenkins, Lon)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lon A. Jenkins on behalf of Lon Jenkins (Jenkins, Lon)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven H. Bergman on behalf of Jill Kendall (Bergman, Steven)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Appeal filed by Appellee Jill Kendall. (Bergman, Steven)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #5 Response to Motion. The document The party filed a Notice of Joinder. According to DUCivR 7-1(a)(4) parties must file their own motion.DUCivR 7-1(a)(4) Motions Seeking Relief Similar to Another Party's Motion. Each party seeking relief from the Court must file its own motion stating the relief sought and the basis for the requested relief. A party may incorporate by reference the arguments and reasons set forth in another party's motion or memorandum to the extent applicable to that party. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to submit its own motion. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket.. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (jmr)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Appellee Jill Kendall. (Bergman, Steven)
October 20, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Appellant Rickie L. Taylor. (Toscano, Paul)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Appellee Lon Jenkins. Attorney Lon A. Jenkins added to party Lon Jenkins(pty:e)(Jenkins, Lon)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Notice to Counsel Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal, e-mailed or mailed to Appellees Robert G. Harding, Lon Jenkins, Jill Kendall, Appellant Rickie L. Taylor. (nl)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-20439. No filing fee required. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Briefs and other subsequent documents filed with the court should contain references to bankruptcy documents using document numbers and dates. filed by Rickie L. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 USBC Order, #2 USBC Docket Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Bankruptcy Clerk's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rickie L. Taylor
Represented By: Paul James Toscano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jill Kendall
Represented By: Steven H. Bergman
Represented By: Russell C. Fericks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert G. Harding
Represented By: Jared W. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lon Jenkins
Represented By: Tami Gadd Willardson
Represented By: Tami Lynn Gadd-Willardson
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jeana Vuksinick
Represented By: Kurt W. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gulf Funding
Represented By: Mark S. Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?