Hyper Scratcher v. 4B Production Enhancement et al

Plaintiff: Hyper Scratcher
Defendant: Robert Ballou, Brian Ballou, 4B Production Enhancement and Tara Ballou
Case Number: 2:2018cv00826
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tara Ballou. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brian Ballou. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert Ballou. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to 4B Production Enhancement. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hyper Scratcher with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Tara Ballou. filed by Hyper Scratcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Madsen, Bradley)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy J. Pearse for Hyper Scratcher. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/14/2018. (las)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy J. Pearse , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3144289, filed by Plaintiff Hyper Scratcher. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Madsen, Bradley)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney J.N. Murdock and Timothy J. Pearse, for Plaintiff Hyper Scratcher. (nl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Wayne A. Jones, for Plaintiff Hyper Scratcher. (nl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3130475) filed by Hyper Scratcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Madsen, Bradley)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Hyper Scratcher is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyper Scratcher v. 4B Production Enhancement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ballou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Ballou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4B Production Enhancement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Ballou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyper Scratcher
Represented By: Bradley W. Madsen
Represented By: Timothy J. Pearse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?