RK Solutions et al v. Vox Nutrition
Plaintiff: RK Solutions and VND Butyrate
Defendant: Vox Nutrition
Case Number: 2:2018cv00828
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order: Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2019. Motions due by 1/16/2019.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within which the deadlines to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is extended by seven (7) days, until January 16, 2019, and Amend Pleading in Response to Motion to Dismiss is extended by seven (7) days, until January 9, 2019, in the above-entitled action. Additionally, the deadline for defendant to file its Reply is extended until February 13, 2019. The stipulated motion is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/20/18. (jlw)
December 20, 2018 Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order for Deadlines for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate, Counter Defendants RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Hatch, Ryan) Modified on 12/20/2018 by changing from motion for extension of time to motion for amended scheduling order (jlw).
December 12, 2018 Filing 25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Vox Nutrition, Counter Claimant Vox Nutrition. (Straight, Samuel)
December 12, 2018 Filing 24 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against RK Solutions, VND Butyrate filed by Vox Nutrition.(Straight, Samuel)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PATENT CASE SCHEDULING ORDER:Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/27/2019. (See order for other deadlines.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/10/2018. (jwt)
December 10, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HEARING set for 12/11/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) (nas)
December 6, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 02:00 PM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (lnp)
December 5, 2018 Filing 20 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Patent Case Scheduling Order)(Hatch, Ryan)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Vox Nutrition answer due 12/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/28/18. (jlw)
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Vox Nutrition. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Berger, Arthur)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 CLERKS ORDER - Defendant Vox Nutrition, Inc. shall have until and including November 28, 2018 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action. signed by Anne Morgan. Answer deadline updated for Vox Nutrition answer due 11/28/2018. (las)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to Clerk of Court to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to DUVivR 77-2(a)(1) filed by Defendant Vox Nutrition. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Straight, Samuel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Straight on behalf of Vox Nutrition (Straight, Samuel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Berger on behalf of Vox Nutrition (Berger, Arthur)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rowennakete Barnes,Ethan J. Brown,Ryan E. Hatch for RK Solutions,Rowennakete Barnes,Ethan J. Brown,Ryan E. Hatch for VND Butyrate. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rowennakete Barnes,Ethan J. Brown,Ryan E. Hatch for RK Solutions,Rowennakete Barnes,Ethan J. Brown,Ryan E. Hatch for VND Butyrate. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rowennakete Barnes,Ethan J. Brown,Ryan E. Hatch for RK Solutions,Rowennakete Barnes,Ethan J. Brown,Ryan E. Hatch for VND Butyrate. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/13/18. (Attachments: #1 PHV - Hatch, #2 PHV - Brown) (jlw)
November 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan E. Hatch , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3144125, filed by Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - CM/ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Swensen, Lara)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rowennakete Barnes , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3144124, filed by Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - CM/ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Swensen, Lara)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ethan J. Brown , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3144117, filed by Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - CM/ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Swensen, Lara)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/25/18. (jlw)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/24/2018. (tco)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Vox Nutrition. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Ethan J. Brown and Rowennakete Barnes, for Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (nl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Ryan E. Hatch, for Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate. (nl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate identifying Axcess Global Sciences, LLC and Compound Solutions as Corporate Parent. (Swensen, Lara)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Vox Nutrition (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3130768) filed by VND Butyrate, RK Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '356 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Vox Product Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Swensen, Lara)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiffs RK Solutions, VND Butyrate is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RK Solutions et al v. Vox Nutrition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RK Solutions
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: Lara A. Swensen
Represented By: Rowennakete P. Barnes
Represented By: Ryan E. Hatch
Represented By: Ethan J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VND Butyrate
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: Lara A. Swensen
Represented By: Rowennakete P. Barnes
Represented By: Ryan E. Hatch
Represented By: Ethan J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vox Nutrition
Represented By: Samuel C. Straight
Represented By: Arthur B. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?