Winters v. Pennymac Loan Services
Plaintiff: Matthew Winters
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv00831
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (las)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Matthew Winters (las) Modified on 11/14/2018 by correcting file date(las).
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Pennymac Loan Services, Plaintiff Matthew Winters. (las)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Pennymac Loan Services. (las)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Matthew Winters. (las)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/5/2018. (las)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Pennymac Loan Services answer due 11/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/5/2018. (las)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Pennymac Loan Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit B - Cancellation of Notice of Default, #3 Exhibit C - 2018 Notice of Default)(Hurst, Alan)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to DUCivR 77-2 filed by Defendant Pennymac Loan Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting PennyMac Loan Services, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Scott, Robert) Modified on 11/5/2018 by correcting Motion type. (las).
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 File Received from Third District Court, Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of docket sheet and documents filed in state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Motion for TRO, #3 Plaintiff's affidavit, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Withdraw of TRO Motion, #6 Order to waive fees, #7 Notice of Appearance, #8 Acceptance of Service, #9 Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit A) (las)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Pennymac Loan Services, Plaintiff Matthew Winters. Form due by 11/8/2018. (nl)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Pennymac Loan Services, Plaintiff Matthew Winters. (nl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180903938, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3130993) filed by Pennymac Loan Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pleadings and Orders, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Scott, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant Pennymac Loan Services is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winters v. Pennymac Loan Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services
Represented By: Robert H. Scott
Represented By: Alan M. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?