Guymon v. Litsey
Plaintiff: John Lewis Guymon, Jr.
Defendant: Douglas Scott Litsey
Case Number: 2:2018cv00850
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION for 50%/50% Assignment of Rights and Written Dismissal filed by Plaintiff John Lewis Guymon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit PX-1 to PX-6, #3 Exhibit PX-7 Supplemental Declaration of Inventorship, #4 Exhibit PX-A to PX-Z, #5 Exhibit PX-8 Petition for Correction of Inventorship, #6 Exhibit PX-FE to PX-ME, #7 Exhibit PX-9 to PX-14)(jwt)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Douglas Scott Litsey. Signed by Anne Morgan, Chief Deputy on 12/20/2018.(mas)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/28/2018. (reb)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Douglas Scott Litsey filed by Plaintiff John Lewis Guymon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(mas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for 50/50 Assignment of Rights and Written Dismissal filed by Defendant Douglas Scott Litsey. (mas)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Lewis Guymon, Jr as to Douglas Scott Litsey served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (mas)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Douglas Scott Litsey. (tlh)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Douglas Scott Litsey (Originally received by the court on 10/30/2018). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by John Lewis Guymon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (tlh) (Main Document 3 replaced with redacted version (redacted dft address on 11/5/2018) (rks). Modified by clarifying replacement on 11/5/2018 (rks).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/31/2018. (tlh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 10/30/2018) filed by Plaintiff John Lewis Guymon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guymon v. Litsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Scott Litsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lewis Guymon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?