Simio v. Flexsim Software Products
Plaintiff: Simio
Defendant: Flexsim Software Products
Case Number: 2:2018cv00853
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Simio filed by Flexsim Software Products.(Foster, Brett)
December 21, 2018 Filing 25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Flexsim Software Products. (Miller, Mark)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline updated for Flexsim Software Products answer due 12/27/2018. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/16/2018. (mas)
November 15, 2018 Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Simio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, H.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (las)
November 14, 2018 Filing 21 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Simio. (las)
November 14, 2018 Filing 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Flexsim Software Products. (las)
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Flexsim Software Products, Plaintiff Simio. Form due by 11/29/2018. (las)
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Flexsim Software Products, Plaintiff Simio. (las)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot James Hales on behalf of Flexsim Software Products (Hales, Elliot)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Miller on behalf of Flexsim Software Products (Miller, Mark)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett L. Foster on behalf of Flexsim Software Products (Foster, Brett)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simio as to Flexsim Software Products served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(Burton, H.)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael G. Monyok for Simio. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/6/2018. (las)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ashley L. Wilkinson for Flexsim Software Products. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/6/2018. (las)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David G. Oberdick for Simio. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/6/2018. (las)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case by Simio re #2 Complaint, (Burton, H.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Simio identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (Burton, H.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael G. Monyok , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3139909, filed by Plaintiff Simio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, H.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ashley L. Wilkinson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3139906, filed by Plaintiff Simio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, H.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David G. Oberdick , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3139900, filed by Plaintiff Simio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, H.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Flexsim Software Products. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney David G. Oberdick, Michael G. Monyok and Ashley L. Wilkinson, for Plaintiff Simio. (nl)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nl)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Flexsim Software Products (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3135695) filed by Simio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 8156468, #2 Exhibit B - Webpages, #3 Exhibit C - Ex Parte ReExamination Certificate, #4 Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Burton, H.)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Simio is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simio v. Flexsim Software Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexsim Software Products
Represented By: Brett L. Foster
Represented By: Elliot James Hales
Represented By: Mark A. Miller
Represented By: Ashley L. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simio
Represented By: H. Dickson Burton
Represented By: James C. Watson
Represented By: David G. Oberdick
Represented By: Michael G. Monyok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?