Pacheco v. Coolack et al
Plaintiff: David Frank Pacheco, Jr
Defendant: Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake and Shannon Coolack
Case Number: 2:2018cv00872
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/14/18. (ss)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/13/18. (ss)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff David Frank Pacheco, Jr. (las)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Shannon Coolack, Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake. (las)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 File Received from Third District Court-Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of docket sheet and documents filed in state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Return of Service, #3 Return of Service, #4 Notice of Removal) (las)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/6/2018. (las)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Shannon Coolack, Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake, Plaintiff David Frank Pacheco, Jr. Form due by 11/20/2018. (nl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Shannon Coolack, Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake, Plaintiff David Frank Pacheco, Jr. (nl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Shannon Coolack, Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake.(Young, R.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court of Wasatch County, Utah, case number 180907477, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3139410) filed by Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake, Shannon Coolack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint in state court) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Young, R.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendants Shannon Coolack, Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacheco v. Coolack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Represented By: Andrew M. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Coolack
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Represented By: Andrew M. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Frank Pacheco, Jr
Represented By: Stephen D. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?