Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation et al v. Dorsey & Whitney LLP et al
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation and Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department
Defendant: Steven C. Pulley, Neuma Healthcare Developement, D. Jason Pulley, E4 Consulting, Dorsey & Whitney LLP, Jillian Kornblatt, Claire H. Topp, Gerald W. Trotter, Lance V. Johnson, 27 C LLC and Alison Grigonis
Case Number: 2:2018cv00895
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 42 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to Lance V. Johnson. (las)
January 11, 2019 Filing 41 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants E4 Consulting, Neuma Healthcare Developement, D. Jason Pulley, Steven C. Pulley. (las)
January 10, 2019 Filing 40 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants 27 C LLC, Gerald W. Trotter. (las)
January 10, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Lance V. Johnson and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department. (Echo Hawk, Mark)
January 8, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants 27 C LLC, Dorsey & Whitney LLP, E4 Consulting, Alison Grigonis, Lance V. Johnson, Jillian Kornblatt, Neuma Healthcare Developement, D. Jason Pulley, Steven C. Pulley, Claire H. Topp, Gerald W. Trotter, Plaintiffs Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department. Form due by 1/23/2019. (las)
January 8, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants 27 C LLC, Dorsey & Whitney LLP, E4 Consulting, Alison Grigonis, Jillian Kornblatt, Neuma Healthcare Developement, D. Jason Pulley, Steven C. Pulley, Claire H. Topp, Gerald W. Trotter, Plaintiffs Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department. (las)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for 27 C LLC answer due 1/21/2019; Gerald W. Trotter answer due 1/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/8/2019. (las)
January 8, 2019 Filing 35 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants 27 C LLC, Gerald W. Trotter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gross, Jefferson)
January 7, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Party Steven Pulley, Jason Pulley, Neuma Healthcare Development, LLC, and E4 Consulting, LLC and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants E4 Consulting, Neuma Healthcare Developement, D. Jason Pulley, Steven C. Pulley. (Hancock, Cameron)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DOCKET TEXT ORDER DENYING without prejudice #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and DENYING without prejudice #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for failure to establish good cause for the extensions. If the parties seek to extend the time for the Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, they must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1) ("When an act may or must be done within a specified time, the court may, for good cause, extend the time with or without motion or notice if the court acts, or if a request is made, before the original time or its extension expires; or on motion made after the time has expired if the party failed to act because of excusable neglect.") Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/7/2019. No attached document. (jjm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. Beckstrom on behalf of E4 Consulting, Neuma Healthcare Developement, D. Jason Pulley, Steven C. Pulley (Beckstrom, Ryan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 31 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant 27 C LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gross, Jefferson)
January 7, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Adam Sorenson on behalf of 27 C LLC (Sorenson, J.)
January 7, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson W. Gross on behalf of 27 C LLC (Gross, Jefferson)
January 7, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Neville on behalf of Dorsey & Whitney LLP, Alison Grigonis, Jillian Kornblatt, Claire H. Topp (Neville, Kimberly)
January 7, 2019 Filing 27 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Gerald W. Trotter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gross, Jefferson)
January 7, 2019 Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support (to Modify Order to Propose Scheduling Order) filed by Defendants E4 Consulting, Neuma Healthcare Developement, D. Jason Pulley, Steven C. Pulley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Cameron)
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Adam Sorenson on behalf of Gerald W. Trotter (Sorenson, J.)
January 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson W. Gross on behalf of Gerald W. Trotter (Gross, Jefferson)
December 19, 2018 Filing 23 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation as to 27 C LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Echo Hawk, Mark)
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation as to Gerald W. Trotter served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Echo Hawk, Mark)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation as to Lance V. Johnson served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Echo Hawk, Mark)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation as to Dorsey & Whitney LLP Waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019; Alison Grigonis Waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019; Jillian Kornblatt Waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019; Claire H. Topp Waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Echo Hawk, Mark)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for E4 Consulting answer due 1/7/2019; Neuma Healthcare Developement answer due 1/7/2019; D. Jason Pulley answer due 1/7/2019; Steven C. Pulley answer due 1/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/10/2018. (las)
December 8, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants E4 Consulting, Neuma Healthcare Developement, D. Jason Pulley, Steven C. Pulley. Attorney Cameron M. Hancock added to party E4 Consulting(pty:dft), Attorney Cameron M. Hancock added to party Neuma Healthcare Developement(pty:dft), Attorney Cameron M. Hancock added to party D. Jason Pulley(pty:dft), Attorney Cameron M. Hancock added to party Steven C. Pulley(pty:dft)(Hancock, Cameron)
November 29, 2018 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation as to D. Jason Pulley served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Echo Hawk, Mark)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation as to Neuma Healthcare Developement served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Echo Hawk, Mark)
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation as to Steven C. Pulley served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Echo Hawk, Mark)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/15/2018. (las)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to E4 Consulting. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Steven C. Pulley. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Neuma Healthcare Developement. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Lance V. Johnson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jillian Kornblatt. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Gerald W. Trotter. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Dorsey & Whitney LLP. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to D. Jason Pulley. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Claire H. Topp. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Alison Grigonis. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to 27 C LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3145378) filed by Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department, Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet w/attachment, #2 Exhibit 1-6) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Echo Hawk, Mark)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiffs Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation and Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation et al v. Dorsey & Whitney LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation
Represented By: Mark A. Echo Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes of the Goshute Reservation Health Department
Represented By: Mark A. Echo Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. Pulley
Represented By: Ryan R. Beckstrom
Represented By: Cameron M. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neuma Healthcare Developement
Represented By: Ryan R. Beckstrom
Represented By: Cameron M. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Jason Pulley
Represented By: Ryan R. Beckstrom
Represented By: Cameron M. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E4 Consulting
Represented By: Ryan R. Beckstrom
Represented By: Cameron M. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorsey & Whitney LLP
Represented By: Kimberly Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian Kornblatt
Represented By: Kimberly Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire H. Topp
Represented By: Kimberly Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald W. Trotter
Represented By: J. Adam Sorenson
Represented By: Jefferson W. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 27 C LLC
Represented By: J. Adam Sorenson
Represented By: Jefferson W. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Grigonis
Represented By: Kimberly Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?