Hogan v. Kroger Co, The

Plaintiff: Barbara Hogan
Defendant: Kroger Co, The
Case Number: 2:2018cv00935
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
0 Judge: Ted Stewart
1 Judge: Paul M Warner
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2019. Fact Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Written Discovery due by 7/5/19 Motions due by 1/31/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Ted Stewart. 3 Day Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Ted Stewart. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Paul Warner on 1/2/19. (jlw)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Edwards, Stephen)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report and within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, the parties shall meet and confer and file a jointly signed Attorney Planning Meeting Report and email the court a Proposed Scheduling Order. Please see order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/21/18. (jlw)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/11/2018. (tco)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal) (las)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (las)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Barbara Hogan. (las)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Kroger Co, The. (las)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Barbara Hogan, Defendant Kroger Co, The. Form due by 12/21/2018. (tlh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Barbara Hogan and Defendant Kroger Co, The. (tlh)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Kroger Co, The. (Edwards, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180908332, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3159016) filed by Kroger Co, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Edwards, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Defendant Kroger Co, The is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. Kroger Co, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co, The
Represented By: Stephen F. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hogan
Represented By: John R. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?