PacifiCorp v. Jacobsen Construction Company

Plaintiff: PacifiCorp
Defendant: Jacobsen Construction Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00936
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Jacobsen Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract)(Mouritsen, Alan)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2019. Expert Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/6/2020. 5 Day Bench Trial is set for 8/10/2020, at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Dale A. Kimball. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/9/2019. (eat)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Jacobsen Construction Company. Answer due by 1/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/9/2019. (eat)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(Biddulph, Blake)
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Jacobsen Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mouritsen, Alan) Modified by changing event type to motion for extension of time to file answer on 1/7/2019 (eat).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/7/2019. (eat)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff PacifiCorp. (las)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Jacobsen Construction Company. (las)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Jacobsen Construction Company, Plaintiff PacifiCorp. Form due by 1/3/2019. (las)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Jacobsen Construction Company, Plaintiff PacifiCorp. (las)
December 18, 2018 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Jacobsen Construction Company answer due 1/14/2019. (kpf)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint. The deadline for Jacobsen Construction Complany, Inc. to file a response to Complaint is extended by two weeks to January 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/18/2018. (kpf)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Julianne P. Blanch on behalf of Jacobsen Construction Company (Blanch, Julianne)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Jacobsen Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Alan S. Mouritsen added to party Jacobsen Construction Company(pty:dft)(Mouritsen, Alan)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by PacifiCorp as to Jacobsen Construction Company served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Larsen, Kristine)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jacobsen Construction Company. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/7/2018. (las)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jacobsen Construction Company (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3159484) filed by PacifiCorp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - Huntington No. 2 Final Construction Report, #4 Exhibit D - Boynton Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit F - Zoellner Complaint) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Larsen, Kristine)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff PacifiCorp is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PacifiCorp v. Jacobsen Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PacifiCorp
Represented By: Kristine M. Larsen
Represented By: Blake M. Biddulph
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobsen Construction Company
Represented By: Alan S. Mouritsen
Represented By: Julianne P. Blanch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?