Goodwill v. Foreclosure Commissioner, The et al
Plaintiff: David A. Goodwill
Defendant: Foreclosure Commissioner, The, eTitle Insurance Agency and Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The
Case Number: 2:2018cv00948
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing ch.7 bankruptcy by David A. Goodwill (Goodwill, David)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE-Plaintiffs must propose a schedule to defendants in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen (14) days. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/28/19. (jmr)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Lift Stay. Plaintiffs time to respond to the pending Motion to Dismiss #11 will be five (5) days from the date of this Order. The reply will be due fourteen (14) days after the response is filed, pursuant to DUCivR 7-1(b)(3)(A). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/28/19. (jmr)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Shiraldi, Melina)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Stay due to lapse in appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/17/19. (jmr)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Shiraldi, Melina)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/10/2019. (tdp)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Memorandum in Support. Responses due by 1/21/2019 Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/9/19. (jmr)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff David A. Goodwill. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jmr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #2 Text of Proposed Order Corrected proposed order) (jwt).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 After review of the case, case reassigned to District Judge per 12 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (las)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case and the #11 Motion to Dismiss, the undersigned ORDERS that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 12/18/18. (docket text order, no attached document)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Foreclosure Deed)(Shiraldi, Melina)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The. (jwt)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant eTitle Insurance Agency. (las)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING of Request to Submit for Decision filed by Defendant eTitle Insurance Agency. (McCormack, Hillary)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING of Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Defendant eTitle Insurance Agency. (McCormack, Hillary)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING of Consent to Removal filed by Defendant eTitle Insurance Agency. (McCormack, Hillary)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant eTitle Insurance Agency identifying Lundberg & Associates, PC as Corporate Parent. (McCormack, Hillary)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff David A. Goodwill, Defendants Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The, eTitle Insurance Agency. Form due by 12/28/2018. (nl)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff David A. Goodwill, Defendants Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The, eTitle Insurance Agency. (nl)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180906786, No Filing Fee No Filing Fee filed by Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet., #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - State Ct. Docket, #5 Exhibit D - eTitle MTD, #6 Exhibit E - Pltf Motion, #7 Exhibit F - Pltf Memo in Support) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Shiraldi, Melina)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwill v. Foreclosure Commissioner, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Goodwill
Represented By: David A Goodwill
Represented By: David A. Goodwill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foreclosure Commissioner, The
Represented By: Melina Shiraldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eTitle Insurance Agency
Represented By: Hillary R. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, The
Represented By: Melina Shiraldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?