Michel v. Brennan

Plaintiff: William E. Michel
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 2:2018cv00961
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/16/19. (jlw)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/2/2019. (tco)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Megan J. Brennan (Originally received by the court on 12/19/2018). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by William E. Michel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (nl)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/20/2018. (nl)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff William E. Michel. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 12/19/2018) (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michel v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?