Rilley et al v. MoneyLion of Utah

Petitioner: Kendra Buettner, Venus Colquitt-Montgomery, Scott Rilley, Jonathan Aldrich and Michelle Kunza
Respondent: MoneyLion of Utah
Case Number: 2:2018mc00755
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Compel Subpoena on MoneyLion of Utah filed by Petitioners Jonathan Aldrich, Kendra Buettner, Venus Colquitt-Montgomery, Michelle Kunza, Scott Rilley. (Albanese, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Albanese on behalf of Jonathan Aldrich, Kendra Buettner, Venus Colquitt-Montgomery, Michelle Kunza, Scott Rilley (Albanese, John)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John G. Albanese for Jonathan Aldrich, Kendra Buettner, Venus Colquitt-Montgomery, Michelle Kunz, Scott Rilley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 11/1/18 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John G. Albanese , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3136248, filed by Petitioners Jonathan Aldrich, Kendra Buettner, Venus Colquitt-Montgomery, Michelle Kunza, Scott Rilley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Stephenson, Eric)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Compel Subpoena on MoneyLion of Utah filed by Respondent MoneyLion of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Gregory Pyper, Jr.)(English, Maralyn)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Maralyn M. English on behalf of MoneyLion of Utah (English, Maralyn)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/15/18 (alt)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Time to Respond to Petitioners' Motion to Enforce Subpoena and Memorandum in Support filed by Respondent MoneyLion of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner. Attorney Nathanael J. Mitchell added to party MoneyLion of Utah(pty:res)(Mitchell, Nathanael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal Service served on Attorney for Respondent on 9/25/2018, filed by Petitioners Jonathan Aldrich, Kendra Buettner, Venus Colquitt-Montgomery, Michelle Kunza, Scott Rilley. (Stephenson, Eric)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal Service served on Registered Agent on 9/26/2018, filed by Petitioners Jonathan Aldrich, Kendra Buettner, Venus Colquitt-Montgomery, Michelle Kunza, Scott Rilley. (Stephenson, Eric)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motion referred to Paul M. Warner. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/26/18 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
September 24, 2018 Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee for Motion to Compel received from Petitioners Jonathan Aldrich, Kendra Buettner, Venus Colquitt-Montgomery, Michelle Kunza, Scott Rilley. (Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 1088-3109639). (Stephenson, Eric)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Compel Subpoena on MoneyLion of Utah, LLC and Memorandum in Support filed by Petitioners Jonathan Aldrich, Kendra Buettner, Venus Colquitt-Montgomery, Michelle Kunza, Scott Rilley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John G. Albanese in Support of Motion to Enforce Subpoena)(Stephenson, Eric)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Petitioners Jonathan Aldrich, Kendra Buettner, Venus Colquitt-Montgomery, Michelle Kunza, Scott Rilley is directed to E-File the Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee (found under Other Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 47.00 by the end of the business day. Once the filing fee event is completed the initiating document (Motion to Compel ) may be E-filed.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rilley et al v. MoneyLion of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kendra Buettner
Represented By: Eric Stephenson
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Venus Colquitt-Montgomery
Represented By: Eric Stephenson
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Rilley
Represented By: Eric Stephenson
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Aldrich
Represented By: Eric Stephenson
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michelle Kunza
Represented By: Eric Stephenson
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MoneyLion of Utah
Represented By: Michael S. Poncin
Represented By: Nathanael J. Mitchell
Represented By: Maralyn M. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?