USA v. Coy et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Penny D. Coy, Randy L. Coy, Ally Financial and Ocwen Loan Servicing
Case Number: 2:2019cv00011
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle D. Adams on behalf of Penny D. Coy, Randy L. Coy (Adams, Kyle)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing.(Lancaster, Aaron)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D. Lancaster on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing (Lancaster, Aaron)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Ocwen Loan Servicing served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Duffy, Charles)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Ally Financial served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Duffy, Charles)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Randy L. Coy served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Duffy, Charles)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Penny D. Coy served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Duffy, Charles)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 1/30/19 (alt)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ocwen Loan Servicing. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ally Financial. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Penny D. Coy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Randy L. Coy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ally Financial, Penny D. Coy, Randy L. Coy, Ocwen Loan Servicing No Filing Fee filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Duffy, Charles)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff USA is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Coy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny D. Coy
Represented By: Kyle D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy L. Coy
Represented By: Kyle D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing
Represented By: Aaron D. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Charles M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?