Gatti v. Granger Medical Clinic, P.C.

Plaintiff: Rebekah Gatti
Defendant: Granger Medical Clinic, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00028
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: Utah District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 16 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney John D. Husted, Francisco J. Valenzuela, for Defendant Granger Medical Clinic, P.C. (jwt)
January 11, 2019 15 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Joshua Charles Borsellino, for Plaintiff Rebekah Gatti (jwt)
January 11, 2019 14 Case transferred in from USDC of Texas Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00345. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER GRANTING ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE: Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively for Transfer of Venue (doc. #6 ). After review of the motion and related briefs, the record in this case, and the applicable law, the Court concludes, for the reasons urged by Defendant, that this matter should be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Utah. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 1/11/2019) (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
August 23, 2018 12 REPLY filed by Granger Medical Clinic, P.C. re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively for Transfer of Venue and Brief MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Valenzuela, Francisco) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #10 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: Reply to Plaintiffs response and brief is now due on August 23, 2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 8/14/2018) (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
August 8, 2018 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 Response/Objection, #8 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Granger Medical Clinic, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Valenzuela, Francisco) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
July 26, 2018 9 Appendix in Support filed by Rebekah Gatti re #7 Response/Objection to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (Borsellino, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
July 26, 2018 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Rebekah Gatti re #7 Response/Objection to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (Borsellino, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
July 26, 2018 7 RESPONSE filed by Rebekah Gatti re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively for Transfer of Venue and Brief MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Borsellino, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
July 6, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively for Transfer of Venue and Brief filed by Granger Medical Clinic, P.C. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Valenzuela, Francisco). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME: Pending before the Court is the unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File A Response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint (doc. #4 ). The Court, upon consideration of the motion, concludes that it should be and hereby is GRANTED. Defendant Granger Medical Clinic, P.C.'s response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint is now due on July 6, 2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/26/2018) (bdb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
June 19, 2018 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #1 Complaint filed by Granger Medical Clinic, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Francisco J Valenzuela added to party Granger Medical Clinic, P.C.(pty:dft) (Valenzuela, Francisco) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
May 8, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Granger Medical Clinic, P.C.. (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
May 8, 2018 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]
May 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Granger Medical Clinic, P.C. filed by Rebekah Gatti. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9173303) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Borsellino, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gatti v. Granger Medical Clinic, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granger Medical Clinic, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?