Springer et al v. Zions Bancorporation
Plaintiff: Lexi Rolfe, Brian Mallroy, Denise Murdock, McKenna Wells, Jack Rolfe, Nancy Fields, Jason Hixson, Corey Thurman, Dennis Guffey, Kareen Springer, Nolan Anderson, Michael Orgill, Jessica Obray, Alan Allred, Dale Mork, Bryce Abplanalp, Rosalie Wells, Edward Terry, Wayne Hall, Stephanie Wells, Tamara Hixson, Shade Properties, Daniel Lemon, Christopher Lyman, Kathleen Callahan, David Dudik, Cody Browning, Don Fowers, Tamara Flint, William Guffey, Mark Mudrow, Scott Piggott, Bryan Powell, Rita Smith, Gwen Dudik, Lael Wells, Alan Lambert, Kristen Thelin, LaDawn Lott, Jean Wells, Annette Guffey, Jeff McCain, Jacob Ingebritson, Charles Clanton, Brady Tew, Dianna Clark, AG Tsunami, Kim Abplanalp, Glenn Miller, Ron Wells, Vickie Mower, Dale Springer, Angie Thurman, Delani Lyman, Vicki Anderson, Terry Fisher, Jaden Wells, David Zuckerman, Ginger Cruikshank, Kevin Avery, Jan Miller, Elwin Johnson, Ronald Scott Wells, Robert Harrison, Stephanie Mudrow, April Wells, Mathew Obray, Katherine Mallroy, Patrick Springer, Daniel McCain, Kevin Maughan, Jessica McCain, Ray Smith, Joyce Stevens, Clarence Fields, Lance Packer, Robin Gray, Adam Wells, JDH Family LTD Partnership, Kelly Flint, Janette Fowers, Kevin Wells, Valorie Lambert, Bryan Barker, Tiffani Grimm, Scott Mower, Victoria Lemon, Scott Seipert, Mikael Thelin, Dean Paul Ivory, Jeff Ransom, Catherine Binsacca, Kent Mower, Jann Mower and Susan McCain
Defendant: Zions Bancorporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00035
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Referring Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Consolidate Case and Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/12/2019. (las)
February 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner added. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to case. (las)
February 12, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per case consolidation. (las)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs AG Tsunami, Bryce Abplanalp, Kim Abplanalp, Alan Allred, Nolan Anderson, Vicki Anderson, Kevin Avery, Bryan Barker, Catherine Binsacca, Cody Browning, Kathleen Callahan, Charles Clanton, Dianna Clark, Ginger Cruikshank, David Dudik, Gwen Dudik, Clarence Fields, Nancy Fields, Terry Fisher, Kelly Flint, Tamara Flint, Don Fowers, Janette Fowers, Robin Gray, Tiffani Grimm, Annette Guffey, Dennis Guffey, William Guffey, Wayne Hall, Robert Harrison, Jason Hixson, Tamara Hixson, Jacob Ingebritson, Dean Paul Ivory, JDH Family LTD Partnership, Elwin Johnson, Alan Lambert, Valorie Lambert, Daniel Lemon, Victoria Lemon, LaDawn Lott, Christopher Lyman, Delani Lyman, Brian Mallroy, Katherine Mallroy, Kevin Maughan, Daniel McCain, Jeff McCain, Jessica McCain, Susan McCain, Glenn Miller, Jan Miller, Dale Mork, Jann Mower, Kent Mower, Scott Mower, Vickie Mower, Mark Mudrow, Stephanie Mudrow, Denise Murdock, Jessica Obray, Mathew Obray, Michael Orgill, Lance Packer, Scott Piggott, Bryan Powell, Jeff Ransom, Jack Rolfe, Lexi Rolfe, Scott Seipert, Shade Properties, Ray Smith, Rita Smith, Dale Springer, Kareen Springer, Patrick Springer, Joyce Stevens, Edward Terry, Brady Tew, Kristen Thelin, Mikael Thelin, Angie Thurman, Corey Thurman, Adam Wells, April Wells, Jaden Wells, Jean Wells, Kevin Wells, Lael Wells, McKenna Wells, Ron Wells, Ronald Scott Wells, Rosalie Wells, Stephanie Wells, David Zuckerman, Defendant Zions Bancorporation. Form due by 2/25/2019. (las)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs AG Tsunami, Bryce Abplanalp, Kim Abplanalp, Alan Allred, Nolan Anderson, Vicki Anderson, Kevin Avery, Bryan Barker, Catherine Binsacca, Cody Browning, Kathleen Callahan, Charles Clanton, Dianna Clark, Ginger Cruikshank, David Dudik, Gwen Dudik, Clarence Fields, Nancy Fields, Terry Fisher, Kelly Flint, Tamara Flint, Don Fowers, Janette Fowers, Robin Gray, Tiffani Grimm, Annette Guffey, Dennis Guffey, William Guffey, Wayne Hall, Robert Harrison, Jason Hixson, Tamara Hixson, Jacob Ingebritson, Dean Paul Ivory, JDH Family LTD Partnership, Elwin Johnson, Alan Lambert, Valorie Lambert, Daniel Lemon, Victoria Lemon, LaDawn Lott, Christopher Lyman, Delani Lyman, Brian Mallroy, Katherine Mallroy, Kevin Maughan, Daniel McCain, Jeff McCain, Jessica McCain, Susan McCain, Glenn Miller, Jan Miller, Dale Mork, Jann Mower, Kent Mower, Scott Mower, Vickie Mower, Mark Mudrow, Stephanie Mudrow, Denise Murdock, Jessica Obray, Mathew Obray, Michael Orgill, Lance Packer, Scott Piggott, Bryan Powell, Jeff Ransom, Jack Rolfe, Lexi Rolfe, Scott Seipert, Shade Properties, Ray Smith, Rita Smith, Dale Springer, Kareen Springer, Patrick Springer, Joyce Stevens, Edward Terry, Brady Tew, Kristen Thelin, Mikael Thelin, Angie Thurman, Corey Thurman, Adam Wells, April Wells, Jaden Wells, Jean Wells, Kevin Wells, Lael Wells, McKenna Wells, Ron Wells, Ronald Scott Wells, Rosalie Wells, Stephanie Wells, Defendant Zions Bancorporation. (las)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven T. Waterman on behalf of Zions Bancorporation (Waterman, Steven)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #9 Notice of Filing. The document is unecessary and is only a copy of the document correctly filed per DUCivR 42-1(b) as #8 Notice. The entry will be marked as erroneous. (alt)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE OF FILING filed by Defendant Zions Bancorporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Establish Briefing Schedule)(Waterman, Steven) Modified on 2/7/2019: marked as an erroneous filing (alt)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Unopposed Motion to Consolidate; and Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Establish Briefing Schedule by Zions Bancorporation (Waterman, Steven)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Cases by AG Tsunami, Bryce Abplanalp, Kim Abplanalp, Alan Allred, Nolan Anderson, Vicki Anderson, Kevin Avery, Bryan Barker, Catherine Binsacca, Cody Browning, Kathleen Callahan, Charles Clanton, Dianna Clark, Ginger Cruikshank, David Dudik, Gwen Dudik, Clarence Fields, Nancy Fields, Terry Fisher, Kelly Flint, Tamara Flint, Don Fowers, Janette Fowers, Robin Gray, Tiffani Grimm, Annette Guffey, Dennis Guffey, William Guffey, Wayne Hall, Robert Harrison, Jason Hixson, Tamara Hixson, Jacob Ingebritson, Dean Paul Ivory, JDH Family LTD Partnership, Elwin Johnson, Alan Lambert, Valorie Lambert, Daniel Lemon, Victoria Lemon, LaDawn Lott, Christopher Lyman, Delani Lyman, Brian Mallroy, Katherine Mallroy, Kevin Maughan, Daniel McCain, Jeff McCain, Jessica McCain, Susan McCain, Glenn Miller, Jan Miller, Dale Mork, Jann Mower, Kent Mower, Scott Mower, Vickie Mower, Mark Mudrow, Stephanie Mudrow, Denise Murdock, Jessica Obray, Mathew Obray, Michael Orgill, Lance Packer, Scott Piggott, Bryan Powell, Jeff Ransom, Jack Rolfe, Lexi Rolfe, Scott Seipert, Shade Properties, Ray Smith, Rita Smith, Dale Springer, Kareen Springer, Patrick Springer, Joyce Stevens, Edward Terry, Brady Tew, Kristen Thelin, Mikael Thelin, Angie Thurman, Corey Thurman, Adam Wells, April Wells, Jaden Wells, Jean Wells, Kevin Wells, Lael Wells, McKenna Wells, Ron Wells, Ronald Scott Wells, Rosalie Wells, Stephanie Wells, David Zuckerman (Adams, Samuel)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan Rosca for AG Tsunami,Alan Rosca for Bryce Abplanalp,Alan Rosca for Kim Abplanalp,Alan Rosca for Alan Allred,Alan Rosca for Nolan Anderson,Alan Rosca for Vicki Anderson,Alan Rosca for Kevin Avery,Alan Rosca for Bryan Barker,Alan Rosca for Catherine Binsacca,Alan Rosca for Cody Browning,Alan Rosca for Kathleen Callahan,Alan Rosca for Charles Clanton,Alan Rosca for Dianna Clark,Alan Rosca for Ginger Cruikshank,Alan Rosca for David Dudik,Alan Rosca for Gwen Dudik,Alan Rosca for Clarence Fields,Alan Rosca for Nancy Fields,Alan Rosca for Terry Fisher,Alan Rosca for Kelly Flint,Alan Rosca for Tamara Flint,Alan Rosca for Don Fowers,Alan Rosca for Janette Fowers,Alan Rosca for Robin Gray,Alan Rosca for Tiffani Grimm,Alan Rosca for Annette Guffey,Alan Rosca for Dennis Guffey,Alan Rosca for William Guffey,Alan Rosca for Wayne Hall,Alan Rosca for Robert Harrison,Alan Rosca for Jason Hixson,Alan Rosca for Tamara Hixson,Alan Rosca for Jacob Ingebritson,Alan Rosca for Dean Paul Ivory,Alan Rosca for JDH Family LTD Partnership,Alan Rosca for Elwin Johnson,Alan Rosca for Alan Lambert,Alan Rosca for Valorie Lambert,Alan Rosca for Daniel Lemon,Alan Rosca for Victoria Lemon,Alan Rosca for LaDawn Lott,Alan Rosca for Christopher Lyman,Alan Rosca for Delani Lyman,Alan Rosca for Brian Mallroy,Alan Rosca for Katherine Mallroy,Alan Rosca for Kevin Maughan,Alan Rosca for Daniel McCain,Alan Rosca for Jeff McCain,Alan Rosca for Jessica McCain,Alan Rosca for Susan McCain,Alan Rosca for Glenn Miller,Alan Rosca for Jan Miller,Alan Rosca for Dale Mork,Alan Rosca for Jann Mower,Alan Rosca for Kent Mower,Alan Rosca for Scott Mower,Alan Rosca for Vickie Mower,Alan Rosca for Mark Mudrow,Alan Rosca for Stephanie Mudrow,Alan Rosca for Denise Murdock,Alan Rosca for Jessica Obray,Alan Rosca for Mathew Obray,Alan Rosca for Michael Orgill,Alan Rosca for Lance Packer,Alan Rosca for Scott Piggott,Alan Rosca for Bryan Powell,Alan Rosca for Jeff Ransom,Alan Rosca for Jack Rolfe,Alan Rosca for Lexi Rolfe,Alan Rosca for Scott Seipert,Alan Rosca for Shade Properties,Alan Rosca for Ray Smith,Alan Rosca for Rita Smith,Alan Rosca for Dale Springer,Alan Rosca for Kareen Springer,Alan Rosca for Patrick Springer,Alan Rosca for Joyce Stevens,Alan Rosca for Edward Terry,Alan Rosca for Brady Tew,Alan Rosca for Kristen Thelin,Alan Rosca for Mikael Thelin,Alan Rosca for Angie Thurman,Alan Rosca for Corey Thurman,Alan Rosca for Adam Wells,Alan Rosca for April Wells,Alan Rosca for Jaden Wells,Alan Rosca for Jean Wells,Alan Rosca for Kevin Wells,Alan Rosca for Lael Wells,Alan Rosca for McKenna Wells,Alan Rosca for Ron Wells,Alan Rosca for Ronald Scott Wells,Alan Rosca for Rosalie Wells,Alan Rosca for Stephanie Wells,Alan Rosca for David Zuckerman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 01/24/2019. (kpf)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan Rosca , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3189356, filed by Plaintiffs AG Tsunami, Bryce Abplanalp, Kim Abplanalp, Alan Allred, Nolan Anderson, Vicki Anderson, Kevin Avery, Bryan Barker, Catherine Binsacca, Cody Browning, Kathleen Callahan, Charles Clanton, Dianna Clark, Ginger Cruikshank, David Dudik, Gwen Dudik, Clarence Fields, Nancy Fields, Terry Fisher, Kelly Flint, Tamara Flint, Don Fowers, Janette Fowers, Robin Gray, Tiffani Grimm, Annette Guffey, Dennis Guffey, William Guffey, Wayne Hall, Robert Harrison, Jason Hixson, Tamara Hixson, Jacob Ingebritson, Dean Paul Ivory, JDH Family LTD Partnership, Elwin Johnson, Alan Lambert, Valorie Lambert, Daniel Lemon, Victoria Lemon, LaDawn Lott, Christopher Lyman, Delani Lyman, Brian Mallroy, Katherine Mallroy, Kevin Maughan, Daniel McCain, Jeff McCain, Jessica McCain, Susan McCain, Glenn Miller, Jan Miller, Dale Mork, Jann Mower, Kent Mower, Scott Mower, Vickie Mower, Mark Mudrow, Stephanie Mudrow, Denise Murdock, Jessica Obray, Mathew Obray, Michael Orgill, Lance Packer, Scott Piggott, Bryan Powell, Jeff Ransom, Jack Rolfe, Lexi Rolfe, Scott Seipert, Shade Properties, Ray Smith, Rita Smith, Dale Springer, Kareen Springer, Patrick Springer, Joyce Stevens, Edward Terry, Brady Tew, Kristen Thelin, Mikael Thelin, Angie Thurman, Corey Thurman, Adam Wells, April Wells, Jaden Wells, Jean Wells, Kevin Wells, Lael Wells, McKenna Wells, Ron Wells, Ronald Scott Wells, Rosalie Wells, Stephanie Wells, David Zuckerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adams, Samuel)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Hixson, Ray Smith, Delani Lyman, JDH Family LTD Partnership, Daniel Lemon, Lexi Rolfe, McKenna Wells, Alan Allred, Corey Thurman, Jan Miller, Jann Mower, David Zuckerman, Jessica Obray, Lance Packer, Kathleen Callahan, Jacob Ingebritson, Cody Browning, Ronald Scott Wells, Jessica McCain, Brady Tew, Jeff Ransom, Kevin Avery, April Wells, Mark Mudrow, Patrick Springer, Christopher Lyman, Janette Fowers, Wayne Hall, Terry Fisher, Stephanie Mudrow, Kelly Flint, William Guffey, Dale Mork, Bryan Powell, LaDawn Lott, Elwin Johnson, Annette Guffey, Joyce Stevens, Nancy Fields, Kevin Wells, Scott Piggott, Nolan Anderson, Kevin Maughan, Michael Orgill, Rosalie Wells, Mathew Obray, Kristen Thelin, Vickie Mower, Angie Thurman, Daniel McCain, Dean Paul Ivory, Alan Lambert, Jean Wells, Edward Terry, Kent Mower, Dale Springer, Lael Wells, Robin Gray, Valorie Lambert, Jaden Wells, Dianna Clark, Clarence Fields, Ron Wells, Vicki Anderson, AG Tsunami, Mikael Thelin, Kim Abplanalp, Tiffani Grimm, Tamara Hixson, Katherine Mallroy, Stephanie Wells, Glenn Miller, Shade Properties, Dennis Guffey, Catherine Binsacca, Brian Mallroy, Scott Mower, Victoria Lemon, Adam Wells, Bryce Abplanalp, Denise Murdock, Charles Clanton, Bryan Barker, Kareen Springer, Jeff McCain, Don Fowers, Gwen Dudik, Ginger Cruikshank, Scott Seipert, David Dudik, Rita Smith, Tamara Flint, Susan McCain, Robert Harrison, Jack Rolfe as to All Defendants. (Adams, Samuel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Zions Bancorporation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3183303) filed by Jason Hixson, Ray Smith, Delani Lyman, JDH Family LTD Partnership, Daniel Lemon, Lexi Rolfe, McKenna Wells, Alan Allred, Corey Thurman, Jan Miller, Jann Mower, David Zuckerman, Jessica Obray, Lance Packer, Kathleen Callahan, Jacob Ingebritson, Cody Browning, Ronald Scott Wells, Jessica McCain, Brady Tew, Jeff Ransom, Kevin Avery, April Wells, Mark Mudrow, Patrick Springer, Christopher Lyman, Janette Fowers, Wayne Hall, Terry Fisher, Stephanie Mudrow, Kelly Flint, William Guffey, Dale Mork, Bryan Powell, LaDawn Lott, Elwin Johnson, Annette Guffey, Joyce Stevens, Nancy Fields, Kevin Wells, Scott Piggott, Nolan Anderson, Kevin Maughan, Michael Orgill, Rosalie Wells, Mathew Obray, Kristen Thelin, Vickie Mower, Angie Thurman, Daniel McCain, Dean Paul Ivory, Alan Lambert, Jean Wells, Edward Terry, Kent Mower, Dale Springer, Lael Wells, Robin Gray, Valorie Lambert, Jaden Wells, Dianna Clark, Clarence Fields, Ron Wells, Vicki Anderson, AG Tsunami, Mikael Thelin, Kim Abplanalp, Tiffani Grimm, Tamara Hixson, Katherine Mallroy, Stephanie Wells, Glenn Miller, Shade Properties, Dennis Guffey, Catherine Binsacca, Brian Mallroy, Scott Mower, Victoria Lemon, Adam Wells, Bryce Abplanalp, Denise Murdock, Charles Clanton, Bryan Barker, Kareen Springer, Jeff McCain, Don Fowers, Gwen Dudik, Ginger Cruikshank, Scott Seipert, David Dudik, Rita Smith, Tamara Flint, Susan McCain, Robert Harrison, Jack Rolfe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Adams, Samuel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiffs AG Tsunami, Bryce Abplanalp, Kim Abplanalp, Alan Allred, Nolan Anderson, Vicki Anderson, Kevin Avery, Bryan Barker, Catherine Binsacca, Cody Browning, Kathleen Callahan, Charles Clanton, Dianna Clark, Ginger Cruikshank, David Dudik, Gwen Dudik, Clarence Fields, Nancy Fields, Terry Fisher, Kelly Flint, Tamara Flint, Don Fowers, Janette Fowers, Robin Gray, Tiffani Grimm, Annette Guffey, Dennis Guffey, William Guffey, Wayne Hall, Robert Harrison, Jason Hixson, Tamara Hixson, Jacob Ingebritson, Dean Paul Ivory, JDH Family LTD Partnership, Elwin Johnson, Alan Lambert, Valorie Lambert, Daniel Lemon, Victoria Lemon, LaDawn Lott, Christopher Lyman, Delani Lyman, Brian Mallroy, Katherine Mallroy, Kevin Maughan, Daniel McCain, Jeff McCain, Jessica McCain, Susan McCain, Glenn Miller, Jan Miller, Dale Mork, Jann Mower, Kent Mower, Scott Mower, Vickie Mower, Mark Mudrow, Stephanie Mudrow, Denise Murdock, Jessica Obray, Mathew Obray, Michael Orgill, Lance Packer, Scott Piggott, Bryan Powell, Jeff Ransom, Jack Rolfe, Lexi Rolfe, Scott Seipert, Shade Properties, Ray Smith, Rita Smith, Dale Springer, Kareen Springer, Patrick Springer, Joyce Stevens, Edward Terry, Brady Tew, Kristen Thelin, Mikael Thelin, Angie Thurman, Corey Thurman, Adam Wells, April Wells, Jaden Wells, Jean Wells, Kevin Wells, Lael Wells, McKenna Wells, Ron Wells, Ronald Scott Wells, Rosalie Wells, Stephanie Wells and David Zuckerman are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springer et al v. Zions Bancorporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexi Rolfe
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Mallroy
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Murdock
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKenna Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Rolfe
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Fields
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hixson
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Thurman
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Guffey
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareen Springer
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan Anderson
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Orgill
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Obray
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Allred
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Mork
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Abplanalp
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Terry
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Hall
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Hixson
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shade Properties
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lemon
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lyman
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Callahan
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dudik
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Browning
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Fowers
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Flint
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Guffey
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mudrow
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Piggott
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Powell
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Smith
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Dudik
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lael Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Lambert
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Thelin
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaDawn Lott
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Guffey
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff McCain
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Ingebritson
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Clanton
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Tew
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna Clark
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AG Tsunami
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Abplanalp
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Miller
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Mower
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Springer
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Thurman
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delani Lyman
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Anderson
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Fisher
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaden Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Zuckerman
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Cruikshank
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Avery
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Miller
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elwin Johnson
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Scott Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Harrison
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Mudrow
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Obray
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Mallroy
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Springer
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McCain
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Maughan
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica McCain
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Smith
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Stevens
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Fields
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Packer
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Gray
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JDH Family LTD Partnership
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Flint
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette Fowers
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wells
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valorie Lambert
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Barker
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffani Grimm
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Mower
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Lemon
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Seipert
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikael Thelin
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Paul Ivory
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Ransom
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Binsacca
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Mower
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jann Mower
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan McCain
Represented By: Samuel H. Adams
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zions Bancorporation
Represented By: Steven T. Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?