Parker v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeannie Parker
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00045
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2019 at 01:20 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (las)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Jeannie Parker. (las)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jeannie Parker, Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. Form due by 3/15/2019. (las)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jeannie Parker, Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (las)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Karina Sargsian on behalf of United Airlines, Inc. (Sargsian, Karina)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by United Airlines, Inc.. Attorney Bryan K. Benard added to party United Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft)(Benard, Bryan)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/22/2019. (las)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United Airlines, Inc.. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United Airlines, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3186633) filed by Jeannie Parker. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Egan, Austin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Jeannie Parker is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan K. Benard
Represented By: Karina Sargsian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Parker
Represented By: Austin B. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?