Vient v. Ancestry
Plaintiff: Benjamin Vient
Defendant: Ancestry
Case Number: 2:2019cv00051
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Dale A Kimball
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/19/2019. (eat)
March 18, 2019 Filing 23 After review of the case, case reassigned to a District Judge per 22 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED: Based upon the Plaintiff's filing of a #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/18/2019. (nas)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Vient as to Ancestry served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (las)
March 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Schedule Conference and Order filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. (las)
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Expedited Disclosure and/or Discovery filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. (las)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. (las)
March 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Defendant's More Definitive Statement/Answer filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. (las)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Defendant's More Definitive Answer filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. (las)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ancestry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(las)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ancestry with Jury Demand. filed by Benjamin Vient. (las)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Ancestry, Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. (las)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Ancestry, Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. Form due by 3/21/2019. (las)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ancestry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail) Attorney Kristine E. Johnson added to party Ancestry(pty:dft)(Johnson, Kristine)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Vient (las)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Compel Expedited Disclosure and/or Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/4/2019. (las)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Expedited Disclosure and/or Discovery filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. (las)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion for Email Usage. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/20/2019. (las)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Email Usage filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. (las)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/6/2019. (las)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: Defendant filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. (las)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Ancestry. (tlh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ancestry filed by Benjamin Vient. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681084932) (Fee Status: PAID) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vient v. Ancestry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ancestry
Represented By: Kristine E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Vient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?