Billy v. Edge Homes et al

Plaintiff: Vanessa Billy
Defendant: Edge Homes, Steve Maddox and Edge Construction
Case Number: 2:2019cv00058
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
0 Judge: Evelyn J Furse
1 Judge: Jill N Parrish
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DOCKET TEXT ORDER finding as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed on 3/13/19, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Defendant may refile a motion to dismiss within the time remaining to respond to the original pleading or within 14 days after service of the amended pleading, whichever is later. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/15/19. No attached document. (mcb)
March 13, 2019 Filing 25 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support (Partial) as MOOT filed by Plaintiff Vanessa Billy. (Andrus, Randy)
March 13, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages (Jury Trial Demanded) against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Vanessa Billy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Right to Sue dated October 30, 2018) (Andrus, Randy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 23 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanessa Billy as to Steve Maddox served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Andrus, Randy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 22 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanessa Billy as to Edge Construction served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Andrus, Randy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanessa Billy as to Edge Homes served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Andrus, Randy)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/27/19. (ss)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/27/19. (ss)
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Edge Construction, Edge Homes, Steve Maddox. (las)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to answer to the Complaint in its entirety, including in response to the First Count, Roman Numeral VI, and Prayer for Relief in the Complaint, is extended until fourteen (14) days after a decision is issued on the pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #12 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/22/2019. (las)
February 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Vanessa Billy, Defendants Edge Construction, Edge Homes, Steve Maddox. Form due by 3/11/2019. (las)
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Vanessa Billy, Defendants Edge Construction, Edge Homes, Steve Maddox. (las)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Edge Construction, Edge Homes, Steve Maddox. (Jimenez, T.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support (Partial) filed by Defendants Edge Construction, Edge Homes, Steve Maddox. (Jimenez, T.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Appearance of Defendant Steve Maddox by Steve Maddox (Jimenez, T.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Mickell Jimenez on behalf of Edge Construction, Edge Homes, Steve Maddox (Jimenez, T.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Finlinson on behalf of Edge Construction, Edge Homes, Steve Maddox (Finlinson, Victoria)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Snow on behalf of Edge Construction, Edge Homes, Steve Maddox (Snow, Christopher)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Vanessa Billy. (las)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/28/2019. (las)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Steve Maddox. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Edge Construction. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Edge Homes. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Damages (Jury Trial Demanded) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3190477) filed by Vanessa Billy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Right to Sue dated October 30, 2018, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Andrus, Randy)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Vanessa Billy is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billy v. Edge Homes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edge Homes
Represented By: Victoria Finlinson
Represented By: Christopher B. Snow
Represented By: T. Mickell Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Maddox
Represented By: Victoria Finlinson
Represented By: Christopher B. Snow
Represented By: T. Mickell Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edge Construction
Represented By: Victoria Finlinson
Represented By: Christopher B. Snow
Represented By: T. Mickell Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Billy
Represented By: Randy M. Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?