Washburn v. WRAG Properties

Plaintiff: Lonnie J. Washburn
Defendant: WRAG Properties
Case Number: 2:2019cv00076
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Referring Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Lonnie J. Washburn. (jlw)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to WRAG Properties filed by Plaintiff Lonnie J. Washburn. Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells.(jlw)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant WRAG Properties. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Garner) Attorney James H. Deans added to party WRAG Properties(pty:dft)(Deans, James)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lonnie J. Washburn as to WRAG Properties served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (jlw)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/7/2019. (tco)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to WRAG Properties. (nl)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against WRAG Properties (Originally received by the court on 2/1/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Lonnie J. Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (nl)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/5/2019. (nl)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 02/01/2019) filed by Plaintiff Lonnie J. Washburn. (tlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (jwt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washburn v. WRAG Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie J. Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRAG Properties
Represented By: James H. Deans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?