Wright v. Amazon.com

Plaintiff: Joseph Wright
Defendant: Amazon.com
Case Number: 2:2019cv00086
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Amazon.com.(Cutler, John)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Submit Attorney Planning Meeting Report. The deadline for the parties to file the attorney planning meeting report is extended until 20 days after Amazon.com, Inc. has filed its timely responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 2/22/2019. (eat)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells.(Venti, Katherine)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joseph Wright as to Amazon.com Waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Langston, Nathan)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/12/2019. (eat)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 02/11/2019. (kpf)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (jwt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Amazon.com. (jwt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Joseph Wright. (jwt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Amazon.com and Plaintiff Joseph Wright. Form due by 2/25/2019. (tlh)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Amazon.com and Plaintiff Joseph Wright. (tlh)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190900497, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3199796) filed by Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Complaint and Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Venti, Katherine)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant Amazon.com is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Amazon.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wright
Represented By: Nathan Val Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com
Represented By: Katherine E. Venti
Represented By: John E. Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?