Miles v. Delta Air Lines

Plaintiff: Genene Probst Miles
Defendant: Delta Air Lines
Case Number: 2:2019cv00097
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. The parties have not complied with the court's Order to Propose Schedule ("OTPS") #5 . The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with Paragraph 2 of the OTPS within fourteen (14) days from this date. Any stipulated proposed Scheduling Order should be emailed in word processing format to utdecf_pead@utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 04/12/2019. (amn)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 4/11/2019. (eat)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Genene Probst Miles. (las)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Delta Air Lines. (las)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Delta Air Lines, Plaintiff Genene Probst Miles. Form due by 4/10/2019. (las)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Delta Air Lines, Plaintiff Genene Probst Miles. (las)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian W. Nelson on behalf of Delta Air Lines (Nelson, Christian)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Delta Air Lines. Attorney Kristina H. Ruedas added to party Delta Air Lines(pty:dft)(Ruedas, Kristina)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/20/2019. (las)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genene Probst Miles as to Delta Air Lines served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Savage, E.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Delta Air Lines. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Delta Air Lines (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3203368) filed by Genene Probst Miles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Savage, E.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Genene Probst Miles is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Delta Air Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines
Represented By: Christian W. Nelson
Represented By: Kristina H. Ruedas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genene Probst Miles
Represented By: E. Scott Savage
Represented By: Stephen R. Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?