Hansen v. USA

Plaintiff: Larry Drake Hansen
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00102
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to the Court and Defendant of Error in 6 Docket Text Order and Request for Amendment and/or Acknowledgment. (mas)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 ERRATA to #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Larry Drake Hansen. Per docket text order at entry 6 . (tls)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to File. Before the court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Page 7 of the Complaint. #4 After review, the court converts Plaintiff's Motion to an Errata and therefore instructs the Clerk's Office to link the Amended Page 7 to Plaintiff's Complaint. Further, the court notes the Amended Page 7 merely deletes "...UCA 13-11-5..." and adds "...and/or Va. Code Ann. 59.1-200A.8.; and/or Va. Code Ann. 59.1-200A.14." to the "Cause(s) of Action" section of the Complaint. Plaintiff is not required to file any additional documents related to this filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/29/2019. No attached document. (tls)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/28/2019. (reb)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Page 7 of the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Larry Drake Hansen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Mailing Envelope)(mas)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL. (tlh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES ATTORNEY for the DISTRICT OF UTAH.
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA filed by Larry Drake Hansen. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681085186) (Fee Status: Paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A a, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B a, #5 Exhibit B b, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (tlh) Modified on 2/15/2019 by correcting the filing date. (tlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Drake Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?