Taylor et al v. National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1 et al

Plaintiff: Alex Taylor and Nallely Taylor
Defendant: EGS Financial Care, Transworld Systems and National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1
Case Number: 2:2019cv00120
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference is re-set for 4/25/2019 at 01:20 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins, per request and agreement of counsel. (kms)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Alltmont for EGS Financial Care,Michael D. Alltmont for National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1,Michael D. Alltmont for Transworld Systems. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 4/27/2019. (las)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Alltmont and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3241296, filed by Defendants EGS Financial Care, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1, Transworld Systems. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Burbidge, George)
March 26, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference is re-set for 4/19/2019 at 01:20 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins, per request and agreement of counsel. (kms)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 01:10 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 After review of the case, case reassigned to a District Judge per #14 Attorney Planning Report, One or more parties request reassignment to a District Judge. Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed scheduling order)(Ady, Ronald)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Transworld Systems.(Burbidge, George)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint filed by National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1.(Burbidge, George)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by EGS Financial Care.(Burbidge, George)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants EGS Financial Care, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1, Transworld Systems. (las)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Motion for Extension of Time, #4 Order, #5 Notice of Removal) (las)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/22/2019. (las)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Modification of Docket: Error: Notice of Removal filed incorrectly. Correction: The Notice of Removal has been refiled correctly see entry #3 . re #2 Notice (Other). (las)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants EGS Financial Care, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1, Transworld Systems, Plaintiffs Alex Taylor, Nallely Taylor. Form due by 3/11/2019. (nl)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants EGS Financial Care, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1, Transworld Systems, Plaintiffs Alex Taylor, Nallely Taylor. (nl)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd Judicial District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180908922, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3209607) filed by National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1 and EGS Financial Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copies of Process and Pleadings Filed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Burbidge, George) (tlh).
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Entry Error - NOTICE of Removal by National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copies of Process and Pleadings) (Burbidge, George) Modified on 2/22/2019 by adding error text (las).
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendants EGS Financial Care, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1, Transworld Systems is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGS Financial Care
Represented By: George W. Burbidge, II
Represented By: Michael D. Alltmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems
Represented By: George W. Burbidge, II
Represented By: Michael D. Alltmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1
Represented By: George W. Burbidge, II
Represented By: Michael D. Alltmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Taylor
Represented By: Ronald Ady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nallely Taylor
Represented By: Ronald Ady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?