Cracraft v. Utah Valley University et al
Plaintiff: Travis Cracraft
Defendant: Utah Valley University and Jared Lesser
Case Number: 2:2019cv00124
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Utah Valley University. (Kaiser, Kyle)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Travis Cracraft (an answer has already been filed on 3/13/19 so cannot close the case per F.R.C.P. 41(a)(l)(A)(i)) (alt)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Utah Valley University. (Kaiser, Kyle)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Jared Lesser (filer did not include any contact info) (alt)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Utah Valley University - answer due 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 3/8/19 (alt)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Defendant Utah Valley University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Utah Valley University(pty:dft)(Kaiser, Kyle)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Jared Lesser. (tlh)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Utah Valley University. (tlh)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jared Lesser, Utah Valley University (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681085263) (Fee Status: Paid) filed by Travis Cracraft. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cracraft v. Utah Valley University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Valley University
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Cracraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?