Mason Maksim Masonry et al v. Ohio Security Insurance

Plaintiff: Mason Maksim Masonry, Kenneth Eskelson and M
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance
Case Number: 2:2019cv00135
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION Defendant's Alternative Rule 56(d) Motion and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ohio Security Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Service)(Shakespear, Paul)
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ohio Security Insurance. (Shakespear, Paul)
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 APPENDIX to #15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendant Ohio Security Insurance . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Shakespear, Paul)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ohio Security Insurance. (Shakespear, Paul)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Annika L. Jones on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance (Jones, Annika)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Eskelson, Mason Maksim Masonry Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Lichfield, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Lichfield, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Eskelson, Mason Maksim Masonry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion for Summary Judgment Utah Registered Business Entity, #2 Exhibit 2 to Motion for Summary Judgment Certificate of Organization, #3 Exhibit 3 to Motion for Summary Judgment Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit 4 to Motion for Summary Judgment Draft Complaint in Underlying Action, #5 Exhibit 5 to Motion for Summary Judgment Complaint in Underlying Action, #6 Exhibit 6 to Motion for Summary Judgment Answer in Underlying Action, #7 Exhibit 7 to Motion for Summary Judgment Denial Letter, #8 Exhibit 8 to Motion for Summary Judgment Declaration of Kenneth Eskelson)(Lichfield, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Ohio Security Insurance. (las)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Kenneth Eskelson, Mason Maksim Masonry. (las)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/4/2019. (las)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Ohio Security Insurance.(Shakespear, Paul)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Returned Summons) (las)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Kenneth Eskelson, Mason Maksim Masonry, Defendant Ohio Security Insurance. Form due by 3/14/2019. (nl)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Kenneth Eskelson, Mason Maksim Masonry, Defendant Ohio Security Insurance. (nl)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190900923, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3214161) filed by Ohio Security Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Utah Business Search, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Shakespear, Paul)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant Ohio Security Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason Maksim Masonry et al v. Ohio Security Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Maksim Masonry
Represented By: Michael D. Lichfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Eskelson
Represented By: Michael D. Lichfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M
Represented By: Michael D. Lichfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance
Represented By: Matthew L. Lalli
Represented By: Paul W. Shakespear
Represented By: Annika L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?