Cassell v. Skywest

Plaintiff: Shane Andrew Cassell
Defendant: Skywest
Case Number: 2:2019cv00149
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Skywest identifying SkyWest, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Petersen, Scott)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Skywest identifying SkyWest, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Petersen, Scott)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Skywest.(Petersen, Scott)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Skywest. (las)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #11 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Shane Andrew Cassell. (las)
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re 12 Request. The Consent/Reassignment forms do not get filed on the docket. Counsel is asked to email the form to the consent clerk at consents@utd.uscourts.gov. (las)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 Entry Error REQUEST for Reassignment filed by Plaintiff Shane Andrew Cassell. (Strindberg, Erik) Modified on 4/9/2019 by adding error text (las).
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Shane Andrew Cassell, Defendant Skywest. Form due by 4/8/2019. (las)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Shane Andrew Cassell, Defendant Skywest. (las)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Petersen on behalf of Skywest (Petersen, Scott)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Skywest. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Todd R. McFarland for Shane Andrew Cassell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/5/2019. (las)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/5/2019. (las)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Todd R.McFarland , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3218194, filed by Plaintiff Shane Andrew Cassell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Todd McFarland, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Strindberg, Erik)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBITS filed by Shane Andrew Cassell re #2 Complaint,. (Strindberg, Erik)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Todd. R. McFarland, for Plaintiff Shane Andrew Cassell. (tlh)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Skywest (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3217593) filed by Shane Andrew Cassell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Strindberg, Erik)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Shane Andrew Cassell is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassell v. Skywest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Andrew Cassell
Represented By: Erik Strindberg
Represented By: Todd R. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skywest
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?