Osburn et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Sandra Osburn and Raymond Osburn
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and Troy Cullimore
Case Number: 2:2019cv00152
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Wright, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/9/2019. (ncw)
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is no longer eligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the current deadline for the parties to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Order to Propose Schedule (ECF No. 6) is extended until twenty-one (21) days after the Court has ruled on Defendants Objection to the Amended Complaint and Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Reject the Amended Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. Section 1447(e) (ECF No. 12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/25/2019. (las)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support (Neilson, Chet)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Osburn, Sandra Osburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order)(Thompson, Brittany)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Regarding Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answer), #3 Exhibit C (Amended Complaint), #4 Exhibit D (Case No. 170904537 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss), #5 Exhibit E (Case No. 2:18-cv-316 Transcript of October 11, 2018 Motion Hearing))(Neilson, Chet)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #10 Objections. The document appears to be a Motion. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading as such. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (las)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS to #8 Amended Complaint and Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Reject the Amended Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answer and Jury Demand), #3 Exhibit C (Amended Complaint), #4 Exhibit D (Case No. 170904537 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss), #5 Exhibit E (Case No. 2:18-cv-316 Transcript of October 11, 2018 Motion Hearing))(Neilson, Chet)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 File Received from Fourth District Court -Provo, Utah County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Return of Service, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit A) (las)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. New Defendants: Troy Cullimore. filed by Sandra Osburn, Raymond Osburn. (Thompson, Brittany)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (las)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/6/2019. (las)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Belnap, Paul)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Raymond Osburn, Sandra Osburn, Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Form due by 3/21/2019. (tlh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Raymond Osburn, Sandra Osburn, and Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (tlh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District Court of Utah County, case number 190400248, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3218579) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Belnap, Paul)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osburn et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Osburn
Represented By: Michael K. McKell
Represented By: Brittany L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Osburn
Represented By: Michael K. McKell
Represented By: Brittany L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Paul M. Belnap
Represented By: Chet W. Neilson
Represented By: Andrew D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Cullimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?