Maverick Trading v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Maverick Trading
Defendant: Emmett Moore and TradingSchools.org
Case Number: 2:2019cv00203
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 26 JUDGMENT that this case is dismissed with prejudice - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 11/13/19 (alt)
November 11, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Maverick Trading. (Mudd, Charles)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Response due by 11/12/2019); granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/12/19 to comply with #5 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/24/19 (alt)
October 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for Extension of Time Order to Propose Schedule of May 20, 2019 filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/17/19 (alt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time file a response to Motion To Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time: parties have until 10/22/19 to comply with #5 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/1/19 (alt)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support. Responses due by 10/15/2019 Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/30/2019. (jwt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time file a response to Motion To Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles) Modified on 9/30/2019 - modified event type to Motion for Extension of Time to FIle Response/Reply(jwt).
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time Meet and Confer filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Emmett Moore, TradingSchools.org. (Arani, Susanne)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Emmett Moore, TradingSchools.org. (Arani, Susanne)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Susanne Arani for Emmett Moore, TradingSchools.org. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/28/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Susanne Arani , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3359120, filed by Defendants Emmett Moore, TradingSchools.org. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order) Attorney Matthew J. Morrison added to party Emmett Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Morrison added to party TradingSchools.org(pty:dft)(Morrison, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint, Summons, Order served by alternative means pursuant to the Order dated August 8, 2019 served on Emmett Moore and TradingSchools.org on 8/15/2019, filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. (Mudd, Charles)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #9 Motion for Service by Alternative Means (via email, twitter, and website). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/7/19 (alt)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motion referred to Paul M. Warner. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/31/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Service by Publication/Other Alternative Means filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Nicholas Vogel, #2 Lexis Cited Authority, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mudd, Charles) Modified on 8/8/2019: corrected motion relief (alt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay #5 Order to Propose Schedule deadline. Plaintiff to file a Motion for Leave to Obtain Service of Process Through Alternative Means on or before 8/2/19. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/18/19 (alt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay re #5 Order to Propose Schedule, filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mudd, Charles)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maverick Trading as to Emmett Moore served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Mudd, Charles)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/20/19 (alt)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Emmett Moore. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING of Civil Action Cover Sheet re #2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. (Mudd, Charles)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3236990) filed by Maverick Trading. Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Mudd, Charles)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Maverick Trading is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maverick Trading v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmett Moore
Represented By: Matthew J. Morrison
Represented By: Susanne Arani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TradingSchools.org
Represented By: Matthew J. Morrison
Represented By: Susanne Arani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Trading
Represented By: Charles Lee Mudd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?