PacifiCorp v. Block United
Plaintiff: PacifiCorp
Defendant: Block United
Case Number: 2:2019cv00302
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) Block United, LLC and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff PacifiCorp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moscon, D.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to Block United. (jmr)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendant(s) Block United, LLC and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff PacifiCorp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bird, Chaunceton) Modified event type and docket text on 6/6/2019 (jds).
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by PacifiCorp as to All Defendants. (Moscon, D.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff PacifiCorp identifying Berkshire Hathaway Energy Company as Corporate Parent. (Moscon, D.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Block United. filed by PacifiCorp. (Moscon, D.)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/7/19. (jmr)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The court orders PacifiCorp, on or before May 21, 2019, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to properly plead diversity jurisdiction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/6/19. (jmr)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Block United. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/6/2019. (ncw)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Block United (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3266620) filed by PacifiCorp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Service Contract, #3 Exhibit B June Statement, #4 Exhibit C 2018-09-07 Email, #5 Exhibit D Sept-Dec Statements, #6 Exhibit E 2018-09-26 Email, #7 Exhibit F 2018-10-19 Email, #8 Exhibit G Jan Statement, #9 Exhibit H 2019-02-04 Email, #10 Exhibit I Feb Statement, #11 Exhibit J Notification of Termination, #12 Exhibit K Confirmation of Disconnect, #13 Exhibit L March Statement, #14 Exhibit M April Statement) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Moscon, D.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff PacifiCorp is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PacifiCorp v. Block United
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PacifiCorp
Represented By: D. Matthew Moscon
Represented By: Chaunceton Blaine Bird
Represented By: Bret W. Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block United
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?