Chase Media Group v. Nuvo Residential
Plaintiff: Chase Media Group
Defendant: Nuvo Residential
Case Number: 2:2019cv00303
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. (jds)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Chase Media Group, Inc.s Motion for Refund of Filing Fee. It is ORDERED that the case filing fee be reimbursed to the plaintiff. The clerk of the court is instructed to refund the filing fees. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/13/2019. (jds)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Refund of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff Chase Media Group. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Laycock, Larry)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Chase Media Group (Laycock, Larry)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- The court ORDERS the plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The plaintiff shall respond by May 17, 2019. Failure to respond to this order shall result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/9/2019. (jds)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nuvo Residential. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nuvo Residential (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3266657) filed by Chase Media Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Agency Letter, #2 Exhibit B Credit Application, #3 Exhibit C Contract, #4 Exhibit D First Invoice, #5 Exhibit E Second Invoice, #6 Exhibit F First Blaze Agreement, #7 Exhibit G Third Invoice, #8 Exhibit H Fourth Invoice, #9 Exhibit I Second Blaze Agreement, #10 Exhibit J NuvoH20 Statement, #11 Exhibit K First Demand Letter, #12 Exhibit L Second Demand Letter) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Laycock, Larry) Modified on 5/3/2019 to correct receipt number(nl).
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Chase Media Group is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chase Media Group v. Nuvo Residential
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Media Group
Represented By: Larry R. Laycock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuvo Residential
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?