Purjes et al v. Diginext et al
Plaintiff: Dan Purjes and Purjes Foundation
Defendant: Ari Friedman and Diginext
Case Number: 2:2019cv00309
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Party Ari Friedman and Memorandum in Support , #20 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Plaintiffs Dan Purjes, Purjes Foundation, Counter Defendants Dan Purjes, Purjes Foundation. (Cherry, Jared)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RULING & ORDER denying #7 Motion for Change of Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/28/2019. (las)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Cherry, Jared)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendants Diginext, Ari Friedman, Plaintiffs Dan Purjes, Purjes Foundation. (las)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Dan Purjes, Purjes Foundation. (las)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Party Ari Friedman and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ari Friedman. (Biehn, Geoffrey)
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Ari Friedman, Diginext. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit Amended Answer; Counterclaim & Third-Party Complaint Filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit E-mail Chain)(Biehn, Geoffrey)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Diginext, Ari Friedman. (las)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Change of Judge and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Dan Purjes, Purjes Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Court Clerk)(Phillips, Gregory)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Finding good cause, Defendant DigiNext, LLC and Ari Friedman's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #13 is GRANTED. Defendants shall have until June 20, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/10/2019. No attached document. (amn)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Diginext, Ari Friedman, Plaintiffs Dan Purjes, Purjes Foundation. Form due by 6/24/2019. (las)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Diginext, Ari Friedman, Plaintiffs Dan Purjes, Purjes Foundation. (las)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Change of Judge and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Diginext. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment, #2 Exhibit Memo Decision & Order)(Biehn, Geoffrey)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Diginext. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Biehn, Geoffrey)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Yevgen Kovalov on behalf of Diginext, Ari Friedman (Kovalov, Yevgen)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Kris Biehn on behalf of Diginext, Ari Friedman (Biehn, Geoffrey)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Magleby on behalf of Diginext, Ari Friedman (Magleby, James)
May 27, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Purjes Foundation, Dan Purjes as to Ari Friedman served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Cherry, Jared)
May 27, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Purjes Foundation, Dan Purjes as to Diginext served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Cherry, Jared)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Change of Judge and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Dan Purjes, Purjes Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Phillips, Gregory)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ari Friedman. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Diginext. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/8/2019. (las)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (tlh)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Diginext, Ari Friedman (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3268325) filed by Purjes Foundation, Dan Purjes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Copyright Registration for the Film Issued on December 8, 2017, #3 Exhibit B - 2018-05-03 Hearing Transcript re Ruling on MSJ, #4 Exhibit C - 2019-04-23 Ltr to DigiNext re Copyright Infringement, #5 Exhibit D - DigiNext re Copyright Infringement - Response) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Phillips, Gregory)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs Dan Purjes and the Purjes Foundation are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purjes et al v. Diginext et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Friedman
Represented By: James E. Magleby
Represented By: Yevgen Kovalov
Represented By: Geoffrey Kris Biehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diginext
Represented By: James E. Magleby
Represented By: Yevgen Kovalov
Represented By: Geoffrey Kris Biehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Purjes
Represented By: Gregory D. Phillips
Represented By: Jared L. Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purjes Foundation
Represented By: Gregory D. Phillips
Represented By: Jared L. Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?