HLIC-Foshan Plastec v. IMSI Medical

Plaintiff: HLIC-Foshan Plastec
Defendant: IMSI Medical
Case Number: 2:2019cv00312
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant IMSI Medical. Attorney Brett D. Ekins added to party IMSI Medical(pty:dft)(Ekins, Brett)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by HLIC-Foshan Plastec as to IMSI Medical Waiver sent on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Higgins, Sean)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/24/2019. (jds)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to IMSI Medical. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean M. Higgins for HLIC-Foshan Plastec. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/14/2019. (jds)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean M. Higgins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3273494, filed by Plaintiff HLIC-Foshan Plastec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C to Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sean M. Higgins)(Thompson, Kyle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF ERROR Description of possible error: Pro Hac Vice filing fee paid for only one attorney re #5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cleve J. Glenn and Sean M. Higgins. Filer is directed to refile a separate Pro Hac Motion for Sean M. Higgins and pay the $250 filing fee required. (jds)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cleve J. Glenn for HLIC-Foshan Plastec. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/13/2019. (jds)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cleve J. Glenn and Sean M. Higgins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3273097, filed by Plaintiff HLIC-Foshan Plastec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C to Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Cleve J. Glenn and Sean M. HIggins and Consent of Local Counsel)(Thompson, Kyle) Modified docket text on 5/13/2019 (jds).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/9/2019. (lil)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Cleve J. Glenn and Sean M. Higgins, for Plaintiff HLIC-Foshan Plastec. (nl)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3270004) filed by HLIC-Foshan Plastec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Court Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C & D to Complaint) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Thompson, Kyle) Modified on 5/8/2019 remove plaintiff name after complaint in text(nl).
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff HLIC-Foshan Plastec is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HLIC-Foshan Plastec v. IMSI Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMSI Medical
Represented By: Brett D. Ekins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HLIC-Foshan Plastec
Represented By: Richard K. Glauser
Represented By: Kyle C. Thompson
Represented By: Cleve J. Glenn
Represented By: Sean M. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?